Leianna Pasmant-Solis v. Herman Gary Paul et al
Plaintiff: LEIANNA PASMANT-SOLIS
Defendant: FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, FEDEX TRUCK, FedEx Freight, Inc., FEDEX FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC., SOUTHERN EXPEDITERS, FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, HERMAN GARY PAUL, FedEx Corporation, FedEx Corp., FedEx Corporate Services, Inc, FedEx Freight West, Inc., EXPEDITER MANAGEMENT SERVICE, LLC, Does 1-50 inclusive and FedEx Custom Critical, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09409
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 N. Hill St., Los Angeles, CA 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09409 FMO(KSx). (rn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-09409 CAS(KSx). (rn)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING filed State Court Conformed re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) (McEvoy, Steven)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. [See document for details.] (san)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Attachments: #1 CV11C- Statement of Consent) (et)
October 31, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
October 31, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Expediter Management Service, LLC, FedEx Corp., FedEx Corporate Services, Inc, FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight West, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Truck, Fedex Freight System, Inc., Herman Gary Paul, Southern Expediters, Does 1-50 inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Leianna Pasmant-Solis. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, served on Notice of Adverse Party and Notice to State Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court. (Moreno, Richard)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, identifying HERMAN GARY PAUL; SOUTHERN EXPEDITERS; EXPEDITER MANAGEMENT SERVICE, LLC; FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL; FEDEX CORPORATION; FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.; FEDEX CORP.; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.; FEDEX FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC.; FEDEX FREIGHT WEST, INC.; FEDEX TRUCK. (Moreno, Richard)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, identifying HERMAN GARY PAUL; SOUTHERN EXPEDITERS; EXPEDITER MANAGEMENT SERVICE, LLC; FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL; FEDEX CORPORATION; FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.; FEDEX CORP.; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.; FEDEX FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC.; FEDEX FREIGHT WEST, INC.; FEDEX TRUCK. (Moreno, Richard)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. (Moreno, Richard)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 19STCV12891 Receipt No: 0973-24708870 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. (Attorney Richard C Moreno added to party FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC(pty:dft))(Moreno, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leianna Pasmant-Solis v. Herman Gary Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC
Represented By: Richard C Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX TRUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN EXPEDITERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERMAN GARY PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corporate Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPEDITER MANAGEMENT SERVICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Custom Critical, Inc.
Represented By: Richard C Moreno
Represented By: Steven John McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEIANNA PASMANT-SOLIS
Represented By: Hamed Yazdanpanah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?