Robert Perchlak v. Liddle and Liddle
Plaintiff: Robert Perchlak
Defendant: Liddle & Liddle, A Professional Corporation and Liddle and Liddle
Case Number: 2:2019cv09461
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of James D. Hepworth re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Liddle and Liddle. (Hepworth, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Perchlak, upon Defendant Liddle and Liddle served on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Raymond Zakari, Registered Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thompson, Russell)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Liddle and Liddle answer now due 1/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Liddle and Liddle.(Attorney James Douglas Hepworth added to party Liddle and Liddle(pty:dft))(Hepworth, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Russell S. Thompson, IV filed by Plaintiff Robert Perchlak. (Thompson, Russell)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Liddle and Liddle. (iv)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Robert Perchlak. (Thompson, Russell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert Perchlak, (Thompson, Russell)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Robert Perchlak. (Thompson, Russell)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Perchlak. (Thompson, Russell)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24716525 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Robert Perchlak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Three Day Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Sixty Day Notice) (Attorney Russell S Thompson, IV added to party Robert Perchlak(pty:pla))(Thompson, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Perchlak v. Liddle and Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Perchlak
Represented By: Russell S Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liddle & Liddle, A Professional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liddle and Liddle
Represented By: James Douglas Hepworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?