Kelly Ford v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Ford
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,, Fox Entertainment Group Long-Term Disability Plan, Does 1 to 10, inclusive and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv09509
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 1/10/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Kelly Ford, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Zietz, Kevin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Fox Entertainment Group Long-Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America. (lh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Kelly Ford, identifying KELLY FORD, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, FOX ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN. (Zietz, Kevin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kelly Ford. (Zietz, Kevin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Kelly Ford. (Zietz, Kevin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24731200 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF Kelly Ford. (Attorney Kevin M Zietz added to party Kelly Ford(pty:pla))(Zietz, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly Ford v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Entertainment Group Long-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Ford
Represented By: Kevin M Zietz
Represented By: Todd Krauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?