Connor Hauer v. NV Nutrition, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Connor Hauer
Defendant: NV Nutrition, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09520
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT NV Nutrition, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by PLAINTIFF Connor Hauer (Attachments: #1 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Clarkson, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file the amended complaint and DISCHARGES the order to show cause. Defendant is directed to respond to the amended complaint by January 23, 2020. (iv)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Connor Hauerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MATTHEW T. THERIAULT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, #2 Proposed Order, #3 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Clarkson, Ryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof Service #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-9520-CAS-GJS, but should read CV 19-9520-CJC-GJS. See Order Reassigning Dkt 8. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connor Hauer, upon Defendant NV Nutrition, LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adam D. Birch - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Clarkson, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the Court's order to show cause by December 16, 2019. Defendant shall have until December 23, 2019 to file a response. (iv)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09520 CJC(GJSx). (rn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant NV Nutrition, LLC. (lh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Connor Hauer, identifying Defendant NV Nutrition, LLC. (Clarkson, Ryan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by PLAINTIFF Connor Hauer. (Clarkson, Ryan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Connor Hauer. (Clarkson, Ryan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24733030 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF Connor Hauer. (Attorney Ryan J Clarkson added to party Connor Hauer(pty:pla))(Clarkson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor Hauer v. NV Nutrition, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Hauer
Represented By: Ryan J Clarkson
Represented By: Bahar Sodaify
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Theriault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Nutrition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?