Debra Colleen Temple v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Debra Colleen Temple
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secruity Administration and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv09531
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:19-cv-09531 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final #12 , Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final #13 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final #12 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The document is accepted as filed. (sbou)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sn)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Pena, Jonathan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Debra Colleen Temple, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 11/21/2019, answer due 3/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pena, Jonathan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order Re Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (nbo)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #4 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (nbo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Pena, Jonathan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Debra Colleen Temple. (Pena, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support Debra Colleen Temple. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pena, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Pena, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Debra Colleen Temple. (Pena, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party Debra Colleen Temple (pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debra Colleen Temple v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Colleen Temple
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secruity Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?