Geico Marine Insurance Company v. Chad Downey
Plaintiff: Geico Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Chad Downey
Case Number: 2:2019cv09541
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Geico Marine Insurance Company, upon Defendant Chad Downey served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lerner, Neil)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chad Downey answer now due 1/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 filed by Plaintiff Geico Marine Insurance Company.(Lerner, Neil)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Chad Downey. (jtil)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Lerner, Neil)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Geico Marine Insurance Company, identifying GEICO Marine Insurance Company; Boat America Corporation; GEICO Corporation; National Indemnity Company; Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.; Chad Downey. (Lerner, Neil)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Lerner, Neil)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24737633 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint) (Attorney Neil S Lerner added to party Geico Marine Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Lerner, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geico Marine Insurance Company v. Chad Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Neil S Lerner
Represented By: Hitomi N Heap-Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?