Vahan Eloyan et al v. Chris Pilkerton et al
Plaintiff: Vahan Eloyan, Armen Eloyan and Anna Eloyan
Defendant: Aaron Parra, Chris Pilkerton, John W. Klein, Armida Brother, Office of US Small Business Administration, Karen H. Holzen and Sandra Mazzoni
Case Number: 2:2019cv09565
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armen Eloyan, Anna Eloyan, Vahan Eloyan, upon Defendant Office of US Small Business Administration served on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020by personal service upon SBA Agent serving female, age 40, 5 feet to 5'4" weighing 161-200 pounds, female black with black hair. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. Not Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration statement attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (shb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Armida Brother, Sandra Mazzoni, Aaron Parra, Procurement Representative US Small Business Administration(shb)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (yr)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 from Armen Eloyan. Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #5 . Receipt number LA198267. (ap)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: IFP APPLICATION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiffs supplemental statement will be due by December 3. Alternatively, Plaintiffs may decide to abandon the IFP request and simply pay the filing fee. If they choose to do so, that payment will also be due by December 3. (See Minute Order for further details) re: APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 . (vm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Plaintiff Anna Eloyan. (car)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Anna Eloyan, Armen Eloyan, Vahan Eloyan (car)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Armen Eloyan, Anna Eloyan, Vahan Eloyan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vahan Eloyan et al v. Chris Pilkerton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vahan Eloyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armen Eloyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Eloyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Pilkerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armida Brother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of US Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen H. Holzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Mazzoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?