Kirk Goltermann et al v. City of San Gabriel
Plaintiff: Shane Salazar, Jim Miller, Takahiro Suzuki, Chris Backley, Jordan Miller, David Pacela, Sean Irwin, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Antonio Negrete, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Jacob Gustafson, Kirk Goltermann, Bryan Frieders, Gregory Kernodle, Dennis Barwick, Brent Curtis Pattison, Arthur Stafford, Hrag Jivalagian, David Milligan, Christopher Eakman, Kevin Murphy, Derrick Doehler, Vanessa Murphy, Christopher Lee Fetner, Erik Walton and Phillip Apparis
Defendant: City of San Gabriel
Case Number: 2:2019cv09575
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Jesus G Bernal
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 36 RULE 68 JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The full and complete terms of the accepted Rule 68(a) Offer (Doc. #35 ) are hereby adopted as the full and complete Judgment of the Court. APPARIS, PHILIP $15,101.00;BARWICK, DENNIS $5,322.52;BECKMAN, RICHARD $4,106.80;CALISHER, ERIC $12,736.84;DAVIS, BRADLEY $7,003.96;DOEHLER, DERRICK $70,369.72;EAKMAN, CHRISTOPHER $11,510.84;FETNER, CHRISTOPHER $4,970.24;FIERRO, GREGORY $9,994.64;FRIEDERS, BRYAN $4,231.44;GOLTERMANN, KIRK $25,184.84;HISSERICH, CHARLES $2,428.08;IRWIN, SEAN $25,816.16; MILLER, JAMES $14,659.64;MILLER, JORDAN $2,386.52;MILLIGAN, DAVID $9,648.92;MITCHELL, MONTE $14,096.60;MURPHY, KEVIN $9,974.96;MURPHY, VANESSA $13,165.56;NEGRETE, ANTONIO $19,307.52;ONG, NEWTON $18,005.80;PACELA, DAVID $16,022.92;PATTISON, BRENT $6,487.36;STAFFORD, ARTHUR $11,569.88;SUZUKI, TAKAHIRO $7,264.20;TERRY, AARON $14,105.76;TRAN, CUONG $11,679.00;WALTON, ERIK $8,409.44;TOTAL $375,561.16. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). SEE DOCUMENT FUR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 24, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. to Notice of Offer of Judgment,, #34 . (Tourgeman, Elizabeth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. (Tourgeman, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/02/2020. (iva)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2020. Discovery cut-off 10/5/2020. Motions cut-off 12/14/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 11/2/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (iva)
April 9, 2020 Filing 31 Additional Consent to Join Action Form re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 (Kalinski, Jacob)
April 2, 2020 Filing 30 The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2020 Filing 29 The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Rule 26(f) Status Report #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: "Other Filings" - Pretrial and Trial Documents - Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
March 23, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT RULE 26f REPORT of Joint Rule 26f Report filed by Plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Joint Rule 26f Report)(Kalinski, Jacob)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
January 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Standing Order filed by plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Tourgeman, Elizabeth)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:12-cv-04884 JGB(JCGx). Case transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09575 JGB(PLAx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant City of San Gabriel. Related Case(s): 2:12-cv-04884 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Minutes-General)(Wilson, Spencer)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant City of San Gabriel. correcting Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #20 (Wilson, Spencer)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of San Gabriel. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Related Case)(Wilson, Spencer)
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Paul McGinley-Stempel on behalf of Defendant City of San Gabriel (Attorney Ryan Paul McGinley-Stempel added to party City of San Gabriel(pty:dft))(McGinley-Stempel, Ryan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer John Wilson on behalf of Defendant City of San Gabriel (Attorney Spencer John Wilson added to party City of San Gabriel(pty:dft))(Wilson, Spencer)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher David Nissen counsel for Plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. Christopher Nissen is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff plaintiffs. (Nissen, Christopher)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman counsel for Plaintiffs Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. Adding Elizabeth Tourgeman as counsel of record for Goltermann, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff plaintiffs. (Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Chris Backley(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Dennis Barwick(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Eric Calisher(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Brad Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Derrick Doehler(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Christopher Eakman(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Christopher Lee Fetner(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Bryan Frieders(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Kirk Goltermann(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Jacob Gustafson(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Sean Irwin(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Hrag Jivalagian(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Gregory Kernodle(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Jim Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Jordan Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party David Milligan(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Kevin Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Vanessa Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Antonio Negrete(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party David Pacela(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Brent Curtis Pattison(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Shane Salazar(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Arthur Stafford(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Takahiro Suzuki(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Aaron Terry(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Cuong Tran(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman added to party Erik Walton(pty:pla))(Tourgeman, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of San Gabriel answer now due 1/10/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant City of San Gabriel.(Attorney Arthur A Hartinger added to party City of San Gabriel(pty:dft))(Hartinger, Arthur)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shane Salazar, Cuong Tran, Derrick Doehler, Arthur Stafford, Brent Curtis Pattison, Hrag Jivalagian, Dennis Barwick, Jordan Miller, Eric Calisher, Jacob Gustafson, Gregory Kernodle, Chris Backley, Takahiro Suzuki, Erik Walton, Aaron Terry, Antonio Negrete, Bryan Frieders, Christopher Lee Fetner, Kirk Goltermann, Phillip Apparis, Christopher Eakman, Jim Miller, David Milligan, Vanessa Murphy, David Pacela, Brad Davis, Kevin Murphy, Sean Irwin, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon City of San Gabriel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Nissen, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Addition Consent to Joint Action Form re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 (Nissen, Christopher)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Consent to Join Action Forms filed by Plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton (Nissen, Christopher)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Errata and Correction to Plaintiffs' Additional Consent to Join Action Forms filed by plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nissen, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Consent to Join Action Forms filed by Plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton re: Summons Request,, #5 , Miscellaneous Document,, #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),, #2 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Nissen, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant City of San Gabriel. (car)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Miscellaneous Document,, #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),, #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiffs Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. (Kalinski, Jacob)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Joint Action Forms filed by Plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton re: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),, #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Kalinski, Jacob)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Kalinski, Jacob)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Phillip Apparis, Chris Backley, Dennis Barwick, Eric Calisher, Brad Davis, Derrick Doehler, Christopher Eakman, Christopher Lee Fetner, Bryan Frieders, Kirk Goltermann, Jacob Gustafson, Sean Irwin, Hrag Jivalagian, Gregory Kernodle, Jim Miller, Jordan Miller, David Milligan, Kevin Murphy, Vanessa Murphy, Antonio Negrete, David Pacela, Brent Curtis Pattison, Shane Salazar, Arthur Stafford, Takahiro Suzuki, Aaron Terry, Cuong Tran, Erik Walton. (Kalinski, Jacob)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24745613 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Jim Miller, Derrick Doehler, Jacob Gustafson, Erik Walton, Takahiro Suzuki, Chris Backley, Bryan Frieders, Phillip Apparis, Aaron Terry, Shane Salazar, Vanessa Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Arthur Stafford, Christopher Lee Fetner, Jordan Miller, Kirk Goltermann, Eric Calisher, Hrag Jivalagian, David Milligan, Brent Curtis Pattison, Antonio Negrete, Dennis Barwick, Sean Irwin, Brad Davis, David Pacela, Cuong Tran, Gregory Kernodle, Christopher Eakman. (Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Phillip Apparis(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Chris Backley(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Dennis Barwick(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Eric Calisher(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Brad Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Derrick Doehler(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Christopher Eakman(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Christopher Lee Fetner(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Bryan Frieders(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Kirk Goltermann(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Jacob Gustafson(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Sean Irwin(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Hrag Jivalagian(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Gregory Kernodle(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Jim Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Jordan Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party David Milligan(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Kevin Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Vanessa Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Antonio Negrete(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party David Pacela(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Brent Curtis Pattison(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Shane Salazar(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Arthur Stafford(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Takahiro Suzuki(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Aaron Terry(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Cuong Tran(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob A Kalinski added to party Erik Walton(pty:pla))(Kalinski, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk Goltermann et al v. City of San Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Salazar
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Miller
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takahiro Suzuki
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Backley
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Miller
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pacela
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Irwin
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Calisher
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Davis
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Negrete
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Terry
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuong Tran
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Gustafson
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Goltermann
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Frieders
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Kernodle
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Barwick
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Curtis Pattison
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Stafford
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hrag Jivalagian
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Milligan
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Eakman
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Murphy
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Doehler
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Murphy
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Fetner
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Walton
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Elizabeth Silver Tourgeman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Apparis
Represented By: Jacob A Kalinski
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ross
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Gabriel
Represented By: Arthur A Hartinger
Represented By: Ryan Paul McGinley-Stempel
Represented By: Spencer John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?