Osho International Foundation v. Chapman Way et al
Plaintiff: Osho International Foundation
Defendant: Submarine Entertainment, LLC, Insider, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc., BuzzFeed Inc, Time USA, LLC, Red Rancho Film Productions, LLC, Chapman Way, Rock Paper Scissors, LLC, Duplass Brothers, Inc., Maclain Way, Meredith Corporation, Vice Media, LLC, New York Media, LLC, Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Vox Media, Inc., Ebert Digital LLC, Newsweek, LLC, Does 1-10, The Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC, Refinery 29 Inc., The New York Times Company, Popsugar Inc, Stardust Frames Productions, IAC/InteractiveCorp, Gannett Co., Inc., Conde Nast, Inc., Penske Media Corporation, The Daily Beast Company, LLC, Meredith Corporation an Iowa Corporation, individually doing business as People, Penske Media Corporation a Delaware Corporation individually doing business as Deadline doing business as Rolling Stone doing business as Indiewire, IAC/InteractiveCorp a Delaware Corporation, individually doing business as The Daily Beast, Insider, Inc. a Delaware Corporation, individually doing business as Business Insider doing business as This Insider, Hearst Communications, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Elle doing business as Esquire, Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company, individually doing business as USA Today, Conde Nast, Inc. a New York Corporation individually doing business as GQ doing business as Vogue doing business as Vanity Fair, New York Media, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company individually doing business as Vulture doing business as The Verge, Gannett Co., Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as USA Today and Vox Media, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Vulture doing business as The Verge
Case Number: 2:2019cv09602
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #14 as to Defendants BuzzFeed Inc, Conde Nast, Inc., Duplass Brothers, Inc., Ebert Digital LLC, Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Hearst Communications, Inc., IAC/InteractiveCorp, Insider, Inc., Meredith Corporation, Netflix, Inc., New York Media, LLC, Newsweek, LLC, Penske Media Corporation, Popsugar Inc, Red Rancho Film Productions, LLC, Refinery 29 Inc., Rock Paper Scissors, LLC, Stardust Frames Productions, Submarine Entertainment, LLC, The Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC, The Daily Beast Company, LLC, The New York Times Company, Time USA, LLC, Vice Media, LLC, Vox Media, Inc., Chapman Way, Maclain Way. (shb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation. (Burroughs, Scott)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation(Burroughs, Scott)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-00753 RSWL (JEMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09602 RSWL (JEMx). Signed by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew (esa)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09602 DDP(SKx). (rn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-00753-RSWL-JEM (Burroughs, Scott)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Chapman Way, an individualMaclain Way, an individualDuplass Brothers, Inc., a California CorporationNetflix, Inc., a Delaware CorporationRed Rancho Film Productions, LLC, a California Limited Liability CompanyStardust Frames Productions, a California business entity of form unknownSubmarine Entertainment, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company;Rock Paper Scissors, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company;Gannett Co., Inc., a Delaware Corporation and Gannett Satellite InformationNetwork, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, individually and d/b/aUSA Today;Newsweek, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company;The Daily Beast Company, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company andIAC/InterActiveCorp, d/b/a The Daily Beast;The New York Times Company, a New York Corporation;Insider, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, individually and d/b/a Business Insiderand This Insider;Conde Nast, Inc., a New York Corporation individually and d/b/a GQ, Vogue,and Vanity Fair;Refinery 29 Inc., a Delaware Corporation;Penske Media Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, individually and d/b/aDeadline, Rolling Stone, and Indiewire;Hearst Communications, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, individually and d/b/aElle and Esquire;Vice Media LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company;BuzzFeed Inc., a Delaware Corporation;Popsugar Inc., a California Corporation;The Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC, a District of Columbia Limited LiabilityCompany;Ebert Digital LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company;Meredith Corporation, an Iowa Corporation, individually and d/b/a People;Time USA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company;Vox Media, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, and New York Media, LLC, a DelawareLimited Liability Company, individually and d/b/a Vulture and The Verge (lc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation. (Burroughs, Scott)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. 1) Missing Judge and Magistrate initials. Should read completely as 2:19-cv-9602-CAS-SK; 2) Filer failed to provide list of defendants to be served re the "TO:" area (see attached re caption attachment insufficient. It is required that a COMPLETE BUT SEPARATE ATTACHMENTS FOR EACH SECTION ON THE SUMMONS. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Osho International Foundation. (Burroughs, Scott)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation. (Burroughs, Scott)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation, (Burroughs, Scott)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24749827 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Osho International Foundation. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Osho International Foundation(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osho International Foundation v. Chapman Way et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Submarine Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insider, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BuzzFeed Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rancho Film Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Paper Scissors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duplass Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maclain Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vox Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebert Digital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newsweek, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refinery 29 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York Times Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popsugar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stardust Frames Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/InteractiveCorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conde Nast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Daily Beast Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Corporation an Iowa Corporation, individually doing business as People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation a Delaware Corporation individually doing business as Deadline doing business as Rolling Stone doing business as Indiewire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/InteractiveCorp a Delaware Corporation, individually doing business as The Daily Beast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insider, Inc. a Delaware Corporation, individually doing business as Business Insider doing business as This Insider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Elle doing business as Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company, individually doing business as USA Today
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conde Nast, Inc. a New York Corporation individually doing business as GQ doing business as Vogue doing business as Vanity Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Media, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company individually doing business as Vulture doing business as The Verge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Co., Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as USA Today
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vox Media, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Vulture doing business as The Verge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osho International Foundation
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?