Alfredo Barajas et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alfredo Barajas and Adriana Osorio
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv09624
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES OF New CaseStatus Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status conference held. The Court sets the following dates: Pretrial conference waived. Court Trial 4/21/20 at 9:00 am Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (yl)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 12/23/2019 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 12/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 12/23/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Skanes, Mark)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
November 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 10, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., filed by plaintiffs Alfredo Barajas, Adriana Osorio. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/4/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., served on November 8, 2019. (Skanes, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., identifying Toyota Motor North America, Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation. (Skanes, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Skanes, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, Los Angeles County, CA, case number 19stcv35599 Receipt No: 0973-24754114 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfredo Barajas et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Barajas
Represented By: Neal F Morrow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Osorio
Represented By: Neal F Morrow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?