Industrial Motor Power Corporation v. Sallyann Lauren
Plaintiff: INDUSTRIAL MOTOR POWER CORPORATION
Defendant: Sally Hopper, Sallyann Lauren, Does 1 to 10, inclusive and Sallyann Hopper
Case Number: 2:2019cv09637
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process Other error(s) with document(s): NOTE: The document is ACCEPTED as filed. Counsel shall take notice of the CM/ECF procedures. Any future document will be stricken for failure to follow the procedures. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by plaintiff Industrial Motor Power Corporation. (Carter, Kathleen)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08637 JAK(JPRx). (rn)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09637 CBM(JPRx). (rn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Sallyann Lauren. (esa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff INDUSTRIAL MOTOR POWER CORPORATION. (Carter, Kathleen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Carter, Kathleen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24755835 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff INDUSTRIAL MOTOR POWER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Summons in Civil Action, #4 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Kathleen M K Carter added to party INDUSTRIAL MOTOR POWER CORPORATION(pty:pla))(Carter, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Motor Power Corporation v. Sallyann Lauren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallyann Lauren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallyann Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDUSTRIAL MOTOR POWER CORPORATION
Represented By: Kathleen M K Carter
Represented By: Heather P Karl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?