Linda Susan Anderson v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Linda Susan Anderson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv09642
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. The document was incorrectly filed as a Subpoena Request. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson., PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 12/6/2019, answer due 4/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. De La Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sese (?). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail receipts)(Gilinger, Lisa)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick)
November 24, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson. (Gilinger, Lisa)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #6 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (et)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Andrew Saul amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson(Gilinger, Lisa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson. (Gilinger, Lisa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson, identifying None. (Gilinger, Lisa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson. (Gilinger, Lisa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson. (Gilinger, Lisa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Linda Susan Anderson. (Attorney Lisa C Gilinger added to party Linda Susan Anderson(pty:pla))(Gilinger, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda Susan Anderson v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Susan Anderson
Represented By: Lisa C Gilinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?