Mehrdad Makhani et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Dr. Mehrdad Makhani and Platinum Management Consulting Group LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Does 1 to 100, Inclusive and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09644
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Chan, Ryan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Chan, Ryan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ryan Ho Wai Chan added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chan, Ryan)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE EXTENSION OF WELLS FARGO'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #11 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint #10 is hereby extended to 1/17/2020. (gk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Joint REQUEST to Extend Time to File Answer to 1/17/2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Elizabeth)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Mehrdad Makhani (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Manavi, Eideh)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #8 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant need not file a response to the complaint by 11/15/2019. Plaintiffs will file an amended complaint on or before 12/6/2019. Wells Fargo shall have 14 days to respond to the amended complaint pursuant to RFCP 15. (gk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION to File Amended Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farrell, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on November 8, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrell, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
November 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by plaintiffs Mehrdad Makhani, Platinum Management Consulting Group LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Farrell, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Farrell, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV32830 Receipt No: 0973-24757250 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (Attorney Elizabeth Courtney Farrell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Farrell, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehrdad Makhani et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Mehrdad Makhani
Represented By: Eideh Manavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platinum Management Consulting Group LLC
Represented By: Eideh Manavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth Courtney Farrell
Represented By: Mark D Lonergan
Represented By: Marquis Ian Wraight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Ho Wai Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?