Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Allwire, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Rising Edge Technologies (California), LLC, Allwire, Inc. d/b/a Joint Venture Electronics, Allwire, Inc. and Rising Edge Technologies California, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv09693
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Rising Edge Technologies California, LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Capitol Corporate Services, Inc. - Lucky Yang, intake clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Marvizi, Daniel)
December 27, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Allwire, Inc. served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Allen Hopkins, agent authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Marvizi, Daniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/24/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
December 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE filed by Defendant Allwire, Inc.. (Horowitt, Darryl)
December 24, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Allwire, Inc..(Attorney Darryl J Horowitt added to party Allwire, Inc.(pty:dft))(Horowitt, Darryl)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rising Edge Technologies California, LLC, identifying Rising Edge Technologies (USA), LLC. (Yacoubian, Talin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rising Edge Technologies California, LLC.(Attorney Talin V Yacoubian added to party Rising Edge Technologies California, LLC(pty:dft))(Yacoubian, Talin)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 12/4/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-9693-DMG (RAOx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09693 DMG(RAOx). (rn)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-9693 ODW (RAOx). (esa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Allwire, Inc., Rising Edge Technologies California, LLC. (et)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Agness, Aaron)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. (Plaintiff's parent corporation); Allwire, Inc. d/b/a Venture Electronics (Defendant); Rising Edge Technologies (California), LLC (Defendant). (Agness, Aaron)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Agness, Aaron)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Agness, Aaron)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24764799 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attorney Aaron C Agness added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla))(Agness, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Allwire, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rising Edge Technologies (California), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allwire, Inc. d/b/a Joint Venture Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allwire, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence E Westerlund
Represented By: Darryl J Horowitt
Represented By: Paul J O'Rourke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rising Edge Technologies California, LLC
Represented By: Talin V Yacoubian
Represented By: Stewart J Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Aaron C Agness
Represented By: Daniel David Marvizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?