Rodney Lewis v. Moki Doorstep Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Lewis
Defendant: Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp., Alyssa Brown and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09747
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Santa Barbara Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Santa Barbara Superior Court. (lom)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER [In Chambers] ORDER REMANDING ACTION FOR LACK OFSUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants have not met their burden to establish that the amount in controversy is satisfied. The Court therefore finds that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action and REMANDS it to the state court from which it was removed. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lom)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL COMPLAINT #17 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until January 20, 2020. (lom)
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clements, Benjamin)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS to Supplemental Declaration of Zachary Brown filed by Plaintiff Rodney Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ozbirn, Jasper)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 19 - DECLARATION of Zachary Brown (Supplemental) filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp.. (Clements, Benjamin) Modified on 12/20/2019 (lom).
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response to OSC filed by Plaintiff Rodney Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ozbirn, Jasper)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #12 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Brown, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey E. Francis, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Clements, Benjamin)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendants are therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendants' Response must be filed by 11/26/2019. Plaintiff may reply by 12/6/2019. If Defendants do not respond by the deadline, the case may be remanded without further notice. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp..(Clements, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp., re Notice (Other) #9 served on November 14, 2019. (Clements, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Clements, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Party and Court of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clements, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
November 13, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Does, Moki Doorstep Corp., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Rodney Lewis. (filed in state court 9/12/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on November 13, 2019. (Clements, Benjamin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp., (Clements, Benjamin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp.. (Clements, Benjamin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Barbara County Superior Court, case number 19CV04876 Receipt No: 0973-24776297 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Alyssa Brown, Zachary Brown, Moki Doorstep Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Benjamin William Clements added to party Alyssa Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin William Clements added to party Zachary Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin William Clements added to party Moki Doorstep Corp.(pty:dft))(Clements, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodney Lewis v. Moki Doorstep Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Brown
Represented By: Benjamin William Clements
Represented By: Peter S Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moki Doorstep Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin William Clements
Represented By: Peter S Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Brown
Represented By: Benjamin William Clements
Represented By: Peter S Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Lewis
Represented By: Jasper L Ozbirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?