Sheryl Tenzyk et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheryl Tenzyk and Larry Allen
Defendant: Honda North America Inc and American Honda Motor Co Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv09787
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Larry Allen, Sheryl Tenzykto Notice of Related Case(s) #36 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tenzyk Docket Report, #2 Exhibit B - Transfer Orders Declined)(Coleman, Gregory)
December 20, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by DEFENDANTS American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda North America Inc. Related Case(s): 19-10136 (Kizirian, Eric)
December 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Larry Allen, Sheryl Tenzyk. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Coleman, Gregory)
December 19, 2019 Filing 34 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, a Telephone Status Conference is set for January 7, 2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Number: (877) 848-7030; Access Code: 4573404. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: GRANTING #30 Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F. Coleman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Larry Allen and Sheryl Tenzyk, designating Alex R. Straus as local counsel. (lt)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09787 MWF (JPRx). (esa)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-08744 SVW (ASx) (esa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Larry Allen, Sheryl Tenzyk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24810770) filed by Plaintiffs Larry Allen, Sheryl Tenzyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions, #2 TN COGS for Gregory F Coleman, #3 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Attorney Alex R Straus added to party Larry Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R Straus added to party Sheryl Tenzyk(pty:pla)) (Straus, Alex)
November 15, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter T. Shapiro. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F. Coleman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:18-cv-06121-JS-ARL, from Eastern District of New York - Central Islip. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-09787 CAS (JPRx). (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda North America Inc. Floyd v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-08744-SVW-AS (Kizirian, Eric)
November 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Eastern
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting #17 Motion to Change Venue; Accordingly, Defendants' motion for transfer (D.E. 17) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/14/2019. C/ECF (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of New York Office Address, filed by Plaintiff's counsel Bradley King, Esq. (Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account.) (KING, BRADLEY) Modified. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Kizirian on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kizirian, Eric) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY in Support re #17 MOTION to Change Venue , or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Change Venue , or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Larry Allen, Sheryl Tenzyk. (Wolfson, Tina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue , or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Peter T. Shapiro in Support of Motion to Transfer, or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint) (Shapiro, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Memoranda of Law in Support of and in Opposition to Motions by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The parties shall not exceed the page limits requested in the March 27, 2019 letter (DE 16). Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/27/2019. (Alessi, Samantha) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joanna Seybert: Pre-Motion Conference held on 3/7/2019. Motion to be filed by 4/5/2019; Response by 5/3/2019; Reply by 5/17/2019. (Baran, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #14 : The Motion of Eric Y. Kizirian for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/5/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11168859. by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Y. Kizirian in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Shapiro, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Pre-Motion Conference set for Thu. 3/7/2019 at 11:30am in Courtroom 1030 before Judge Joanna Seybert. See attached Notice. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 2/4/2019. (Baran, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Response to Honda's Letter Motion for pre-motion conference by Larry Allen, Sheryl Tenzyk (KING, BRADLEY) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for all Defendants to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including December 21, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/27/2018. (Jacobwitz, Beth) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Shapiro, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F. Coleman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Coleman, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #7 : The Motion of Gregory Coleman for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/15/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-10932675. by Larry Allen, Sheryl Tenzyk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Coleman, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheryl Tenzyk. Honda North America, Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Wolfson, Tina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheryl Tenzyk. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Wolfson, Tina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10896395 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Sheryl Tenzyk, Larry Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Wolfson, Tina) Modified on 11/2/2018 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheryl Tenzyk et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America Inc
Represented By: Eric Kizirian
Represented By: Peter T. Shapiro
Represented By: Peter Thomas Shapiro
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: Eric Kizirian
Represented By: Peter T. Shapiro
Represented By: Peter Thomas Shapiro
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Tenzyk
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Bradley K King
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Allen
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Bradley K King
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?