Brian Whitaker v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv09793
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY in support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(B)(6) #14 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 RJN ISO Reply to Motion to Dismiss)(Cannizzaro, Charles)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(B)(6) #14 filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Montgomery, Elliott)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Attorney Charles Michael Cannizzaro added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft)) (Cannizzaro, Charles)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CSC - LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE- Becky De george in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACTCLAIM by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim. This claim is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff asserting it in state court. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiffs ADA claim. (shb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response #10 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Handy, Russell)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09793 CJC(MRWx). (rn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S UNRUH ACT CLAIM by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause as to why it should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over his Unruh Act claim for similar reasons. Plaintiff shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause by December 3, 2019. (iv)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (ghap)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24787753 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Charles Michael Cannizzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Elliott Charles Montgomery
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?