Merle E. Jones v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Merle E. Jones, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Teresa C. Jones (Deceased) and Merle E. Jones
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Comsumer Inc. and Johnson and Johnson
Case Number: 2:2019cv09803
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Conditional Transfer Order - 184 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 2738. Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1407, case transferred to the District of New Jersey. With the consent of that Court, all actions have been assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (shb) Modified on 12/4/2019 (shb).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09803 DDP(SKx). (rn)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Merle E. Jones, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Teresa C. Jones (Deceased), (Williams, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Merle E. Jones, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Teresa C. Jones (Deceased). (Williams, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24789002 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Merle E. Jones, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Teresa C. Jones (Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Michael J Williams added to party Merle E. Jones, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Teresa C. Jones (Deceased)(pty:pla))(Williams, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merle E. Jones v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle E. Jones, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Teresa C. Jones (Deceased)
Represented By: Michael J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle E. Jones
Represented By: Michael J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Comsumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?