Tiffany Wells v. Melissa V. Jefferson
Plaintiff: Tiffany Wells
Defendant: Melissa V. Jefferson
Case Number: 2:2019cv09808
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Melissa V. Jefferson, (Hill, Joanna)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Grimm counsel for Defendant Melissa V. Jefferson. Adding Emily C. Grimm as counsel of record for Melissa V. Jefferson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Melissa V. Jefferson. (Attorney Emily Grimm added to party Melissa V. Jefferson(pty:dft))(Grimm, Emily)
December 17, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joanna M Hill counsel for Defendant Melissa V. Jefferson. Adding Joanna M. Hill as counsel of record for Melissa V. Jefferson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Melissa V. Jefferson. (Attorney Joanna M Hill added to party Melissa V. Jefferson(pty:dft))(Hill, Joanna)
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zia F Modabber counsel for Defendant Melissa V. Jefferson. Adding Zia F. Modabber as counsel of record for Melissa V. Jefferson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Melissa V. Jefferson. (Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Melissa V. Jefferson(pty:dft))(Modabber, Zia)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Michael A Rose APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tiffany Wells, designating Natalie S Pang as local counsel. (bm)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn A Hettler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tiffany Wells, designating Natalie S Pang as local counsel. (bm)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Wells. upon Melissa V. Jefferson waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Zia F. Modabber, Counsel. (Prongay, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09808 PSG (SKx). (mrgo)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn A. Hettler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tiffany Wells (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24810050) filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing) (Pang, Natalie)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tiffany Wells (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24810007) filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing) (Pang, Natalie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Larry Nussbaum. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn A Hettler. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael A Rose. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Melissa V. Jefferson. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Tweet, #2 Exhibit B - Threatening Tweets, #3 Exhibit C - Reply Tweet, #4 Exhibit D - Apology Tweet)(Prongay, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Wells, (Prongay, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Wells. (Prongay, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Wells. (Prongay, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24789658 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Wells. (Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Tiffany Wells(pty:pla))(Prongay, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiffany Wells v. Melissa V. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Wells
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Natalie S Pang
Represented By: Kathryn A Hettler
Represented By: Michael A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa V. Jefferson
Represented By: Zia F Modabber
Represented By: Emily Grimm
Represented By: Joanna M Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?