Harbour Island Development Management, LLC et al v. 4M Harbour Island Ltd.
Plaintiff: Bernard Ross, Holly Ross, Harbour Island Development Management, LLC and Caribbean Consultants, LLC
Defendant: 4M Harbour Island Ltd. and DOES 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09812
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY reply to opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike #14 filed by Defendant 4M Harbour Island Ltd.. (Sheffield, Andrew)
January 5, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike #14 filed by Plaintiffs Caribbean Consultants, LLC, Harbour Island Development Management, LLC, Bernard Ross, Holly Ross. (Zuidema, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for April 20, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020. (sw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike filed by Defendant 4M Harbour Island Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points & Auth ISO Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Strike, #2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Strike) (Morgan, Chelsie)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 4M Harbour Island Ltd., identifying Bahamian internation business corporation. (Morgan, Chelsie)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 , for the following reasons: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Document filed is a motion, not an answer. Certification of Interested Parties must be filed as a separate document, not an attachment. LR 7.1-1. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 **STRICKEN DOCUMENT** SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 12. ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Motion to Dismiss/Strike filed by Defendant 4M Harbour Island Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Memorandum Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Memorandum Certificate of Interested Parties)(Attorney Chelsie L Morgan added to party 4M Harbour Island Ltd.(pty:dft))(Morgan, Chelsie) Modified on 12/26/2019 (et).
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Holly Ross, Harbour Island Development Management, LLC, Bernard Ross, Caribbean Consultants, LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Judith Fernandez - Office Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Corrected for Typo in Case No. (Zuidema, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Holly Ross, Harbour Island Development Management, LLC, Bernard Ross, Caribbean Consultants, LLC, upon Defendant 4M Harbour Island Ltd. served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Judith Fernandez - Office Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Zuidema, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant 4M Harbour Island Ltd. (jtil)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Caribbean Consultants, LLC, Harbour Island Development Management, LLC, Bernard Ross, Holly Ross. (Zuidema, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST Summons in Civil Action with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 11/15/2019, receipt number 26LHT88R), filed by Plaintiffs Holly Ross, Harbour Island Development Management, LLC, Bernard Ross, Caribbean Consultants, LLC.(Zuidema, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Zuidema, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24790462 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Holly Ross, Harbour Island Development Management, LLC, Bernard Ross, Caribbean Consultants, LLC. (Attorney Jeffrey Alan Zuidema added to party Caribbean Consultants, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Zuidema added to party Harbour Island Development Management, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Zuidema added to party Bernard Ross(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Zuidema added to party Holly Ross(pty:pla))(Zuidema, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbour Island Development Management, LLC et al v. 4M Harbour Island Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4M Harbour Island Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew K Sheffield
Represented By: Chelsie L Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zuidema
Represented By: Richard K Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zuidema
Represented By: Richard K Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbour Island Development Management, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zuidema
Represented By: Richard K Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribbean Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zuidema
Represented By: Richard K Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?