Art Hernandez et al v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: David Casas, Alfred Gonzalez, Art Hernandez, Oscar Escobedo, Ariela Lemus, Louis Granados, Benjamin Zaredini and Mario Contreras
Defendant: Michael Hernandez, Gregory Rodriguez, David Silverio, Rafael Munoz, Does 1-10, inclusive, G-Rod, Silver, Bam Bam, Big Listo and County of Los Angeles
Petitioner: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Case Number: 2:2019cv09823
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles. (lom)
January 6, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John F. Walter. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss the twelfth cause of action for deprivation of civil rights under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and thirteenth cause of action for conspiracy to interfere with civil rights under 42 U.S.C. 1985 as alleged in the First Amended Complaint and those claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. In light of the fact that the Court has dismissed the only claims over which this Court has original jurisdiction and after considering judicial economy, convenience, and fairness, the Court, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' remaining state law claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(3). Accordingly, this action is REMANDED to Los Angeles Superior Court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (lom)
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 24, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Ewell counsel for Defendants Rafael Munoz, Gregory Rodriguez, David Silverio. Adding Gary Ewell as counsel of record for Rafael Munoz, Gregory Rodriguez, David Silverio for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rafael Munoz, Gregory Rodriguez, David Silverio. (Attorney Gary Ewell added to party Rafael Munoz(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Ewell added to party Gregory Rodriguez(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Ewell added to party David Silverio(pty:dft))(Ewell, Gary)
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 30-60 days, filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.. (Hashmall, Jennifer)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the County must file its response to the First Amended Complaint on or before January 21, 2020, unless the time to file is extended further to allow for mediation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (et)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for January 6, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before December 23, 2019. (et)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: APPLICATION for Removal of Removal of Civil Action from State Court. #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Clerical Error (G-11), #12 . Document number 12 due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to attach the entire image of the new action. (ghap)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #11 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #10 . Document number 10 and 11 due to clerical error. The CV-18 and ADR-8 was docketed twice to the new action. (ghap)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/26/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 14] NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #11 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #10 . Document number 10 and 11 due to clerical error. The CV-18 and ADR-8 was docketed twice to the new action. (ghap) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ghap).
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/26/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 13] NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ghap).
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/26/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 13] NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ghap).
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 21, 2020 filed by Defendant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Miller, Louis)
November 22, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-24837674 for $400 filing fee. (Miller, Louis)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants County of Los Angeles, Does 1-100 inclusive, Michael Hernandez, Rafael Munoz, Gregory Rodriguez, David Silverio amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Mario Contreras, Benjamin Zaredini, Oscar Escobedo, Alfred Gonzalez, Ariela Lemus, David Casas, Art Hernandez, Louis Granados. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 7)(ghap)
November 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants County of Los Angeles, Does 1-10 inclusive, Michael Hernandez, Rafael Munoz, Gregory Rodriguez, David Silverio. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Mario Contreras, Benjamin Zaredini, Oscar Escobedo, Alfred Gonzalez, Ariela Lemus, David Casas, Art Hernandez, Louis Granados. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Louis R Miller on behalf of Movant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, (Miller, Louis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Louis R Miller on behalf of Movant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, (Miller, Louis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Louis R Miller on behalf of Movant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, (Miller, Louis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,. (Miller, Louis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL-FILED as APPLICATION for Removal of Removal of Civil Action from State Court. filed by Defendant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7) (Attorney Louis R Miller added to party COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,(pty:bkmov)) (Miller, Louis) Modified on 11/27/2019 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Art Hernandez et al v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Casas
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Gonzalez
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Hernandez
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Escobedo
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariela Lemus
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Granados
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Zaredini
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Contreras
Represented By: Vincent Miller
Represented By: Michael Alexander Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Rodriguez
Represented By: Gary Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Silverio
Represented By: Gary Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Munoz
Represented By: Gary Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G-Rod
Represented By: Gary Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver
Represented By: Gary Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bam Bam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Listo
Represented By: Gary Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Jennifer Mira Hashmall
Represented By: Louis R Miller
Represented By: Emily Anne Sanchirico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Represented By: Louis R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?