Brian Whitaker v. Pasadena Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Pasadena Restaurant, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09881
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS UNRUH CLAIM by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. The Court therefore dismisses that claim without prejudice. See 28 USC Sub-section 1367(c)(2) and (c)(4). The Court likewise denies Plaintiff's requests for a certification for interlocutory appeal and for a stay pending the outcome of Ninth Circuit Case No. 19-55974. (jp)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pasadena Restaurant, Inc. answer now due 2/14/2020, filed by Defendants Pasadena Restaurant, Inc..(Attorney H Jack Bazerkanian added to party Pasadena Restaurant, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bazerkanian, H)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Pasadena Restaurant, Inc. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ton tao - the manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of service)(Handy, Russell)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than December 20, 2019. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lom)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pasadena Restaurant, Inc. (jtil)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24805429 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Pasadena Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: H Jack Bazerkanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?