Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc. v. Pilot Air Freight, LLC
Plaintiff: Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Pilot Air Freight, LLC and Pilot Air Freight, LLC a Delaware company doing business as Pilot Freight Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv09942
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pilot Air Freight, LLC, (Jeffries, Kathleen)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Pilot Air Freight, LLC.(Jeffries, Kathleen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pilot Air Freight, LLC answer now due 1/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Pilot Air Freight, LLC.(Attorney Kathleen Collins Jeffries added to party Pilot Air Freight, LLC(pty:dft))(Jeffries, Kathleen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc., upon Defendant Pilot Air Freight, LLC served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, authorized employee of CSC Lawyer Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kavaller, Miles)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09942 PSG (SSx). (esa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pilot Air Freight, LLC. (jtil)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc.. (Kavaller, Miles)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc., (Kavaller, Miles)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc.. (Kavaller, Miles)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24817034 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc.. (Attorney Miles L Kavaller added to party Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc. (pty:pla))(Kavaller, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc. v. Pilot Air Freight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradigm Innovations Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Air Freight, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Air Freight, LLC a Delaware company doing business as Pilot Freight Services
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?