Vicki Jane Luckenbach v. American Airlines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vicki Jane Luckenbach
Defendant: DOES 1-10, American Airlines Inc and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv10037
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc, identifying Vicki Jane Luckenbach, American Airlines, Inc.. (Mangarpan, Tina)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc.. (Mangarpan, Tina)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc.(Attorney Tina I. Mangarpan added to party American Airlines Inc(pty:dft))(Mangarpan, Tina)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10037 CBM(MRWx). (rn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant American Airlines Inc. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vicki Jane Luckenbach, (Andersen, Nicole)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Vicki Jane Luckenbach. (Andersen, Nicole)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vicki Jane Luckenbach. (Andersen, Nicole)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24838047 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Vicki Jane Luckenbach. (Attorney Nicole Christiane Andersen added to party Vicki Jane Luckenbach(pty:pla))(Andersen, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vicki Jane Luckenbach v. American Airlines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc
Represented By: Tina I. Mangarpan
Represented By: Jeffrey S Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Jane Luckenbach
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Represented By: Stuart R Fraenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?