United States of America v. Abens Maurice
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Abens Maurice
Case Number: 2:2019cv10065
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:3184
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF CONSENT TO EXTRADITION filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Lulejian, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 [Proposed] CERTIFICATION OF EXTRADITABILITY AND ORDER OF COMMITMENT filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Lulejian, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR EXTRADITION; REDACTED EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lulejian, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION TO FUGITIVE'S APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DETENTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOHN J. LULEJIAN; EXHIBIT filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Lulejian, John)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SEALING by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #17 EX PARTE APPLICATION for sealed filing. The government's Request for Extradition and accompanying exhibits, which include the original formal extradition documents and diplomatic note from the Government of Ireland bearing ribbons and seals, except that counsel for the fugitive Abens Maurice, as well a counsel for the government, may have access to those documents. (sp)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The within action has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John F. Walter and referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for decision pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3184 and General Order 05-07. (car)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney on behalf of plaintiff United States of America. (car)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE filed by plaintiff United States of America. (car)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FILING ITS REQUEST FOR EXTRADITION UNDER SEAL WITHOUT COPIES OR SERVICE OF EXHIBITS (ORIGINAL FORMAL EXTRADITION DOCUMENTS); DECLARATION OF JOHN J. LULEJIAN filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (car)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED REQUEST FOR EXTRADITION; EXHIBITS of Defendant Abens Maurice to Ireland, assigned to Judge John F. Walter. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (car)
November 25, 2019 MAGISTRATE CASE No. 2:19-mj-04422-DUTY-1 is consolidated with this case. All documents filed in the magistrate case are consolidated with this civil action. Please refer to the magistrate case docket sheet to review docket entries made prior to the start of this civil action. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Abens Maurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abens Maurice
Represented By: Adam Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John J Lulejian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?