Tracy Eggleston v. Direct Protect Security and Surveillance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracy Eggleston
Defendant: DIRECT PROTECT SECURITY & SURVEILLANCE, INC. and Direct Protect Security and Surveillance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10071
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Alternative Service upon Direct Protect Security and Surveillance, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Direct Protect Statement of Information, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Diligence, #3 Proposed Order) (Smith, Taylor)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #6 Non-Resident Attorney Patrick H Peluso APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston, designating Aaron D Aftergood as local counsel. (bm)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #5 Non-Resident Attorney Taylor T Smith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston, designating Aaron D Aftergood as local counsel. (bm)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aftergood, Aaron)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Direct Protect Security and Surveillance, Inc. (bm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. (Aftergood, Aaron)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick H. Peluso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24847380) filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Aftergood, Aaron)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor T. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24847350) filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Aftergood, Aaron)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston, (Aftergood, Aaron)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. (Aftergood, Aaron)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. (Aftergood, Aaron)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24847266 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tracy Eggleston. (Attorney Aaron D Aftergood added to party Tracy Eggleston(pty:pla))(Aftergood, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy Eggleston v. Direct Protect Security and Surveillance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECT PROTECT SECURITY & SURVEILLANCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Protect Security and Surveillance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Eggleston
Represented By: Aaron D Aftergood
Represented By: Taylor T Smith
Represented By: Patrick H Peluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?