Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Cambridge Select, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive and Cambridge Select, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10096
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10096 ODW(PLAx). (rn)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cambridge Select, Inc. answer now due 1/26/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation.(Blakely, Brent)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-10096 CAS (PLAx). (esa)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Cambridge Select, Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blakely, Brent)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shiqian Zhai counsel for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. Adding Mark S. Zhai as counsel of record for Deckers Outdoor Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Shiqian Zhai added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Zhai, Shiqian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cambridge Select, Inc. (et)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 CV11C- Statement of Consent) (et)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24851861 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Brent H Blakely added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Blakely, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Cambridge Select, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Select, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Represented By: Brent H Blakely
Represented By: Mark S Zhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?