Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Mad About Heels et al
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive and Mad About Heels
Case Number: 2:2019cv10103
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Mad About Heels served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hieu Lam, Owner/Agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blakely, Brent)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shiqian Zhai counsel for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. Adding Mark S. Zhai as counsel of record for Deckers Outdoor Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Shiqian Zhai added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Zhai, Shiqian)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mad About Heels. (et)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24852806 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Brent H Blakely added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Blakely, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Mad About Heels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mad About Heels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Represented By: Brent H Blakely
Represented By: Mark S Zhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?