Sun Hong Foods, Inc. v. Outstanding Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sun Hong Foods, Inc.
Defendant: William "Bill" Glaser, David "Dave" Anderson and Outstanding Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10121
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. In light of the stipulation, the Court VACATES the January 22, 2020 hearing on the Application. Defendant's opposition shall be due by February 5, 2020, and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by February 10, 2020. Because the case may be reassigned to a district judge prior to the proposed hearing date, the Court will not set a continued hearing date at this time. If the case remains assigned to the undersigned, the Court will set a hearing date. (dml)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing On Plaintiff's Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment from January 22, 2020 at 10:00am to February 12, 2020 at 10:00am Re: APPLICATION for Writ of of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #7 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #14 filed by Plaintiff Sun Hong Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewicki, Alexander)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DIRECTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. It is not clear if the Application has been timely served on Outstanding Foods. Accordingly, the parties are directed to file a joint status report by January 16, 2020 regarding the status of service of the Application on Outstanding Foods. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS AND DEADLINES. (dml)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James H Moon on behalf of Defendants David "Dave" Anderson, William "Bill" Glaser, Outstanding Foods, Inc. (Attorney James H Moon added to party David "Dave" Anderson (pty:dft), Attorney James H Moon added to party William "Bill" Glaser (pty:dft), Attorney James H Moon added to party Outstanding Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Moon, James)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants David "Dave" Anderson, William "Bill" Glaser, Outstanding Foods, Inc., (Harper, Jacob)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants David "Dave" Anderson, William "Bill" Glaser, Outstanding Foods, Inc..(Attorney Jacob Michael Harper added to party David "Dave" Anderson (pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Michael Harper added to party William "Bill" Glaser (pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Michael Harper added to party Outstanding Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Harper, Jacob)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Sun Hong Foods, Inc., re APPLICATION for Writ of of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #7 Service On Outstanding Foods, Inc. By Serving Corporate Officer David "Dave" Anderson, served on 12/17/2019. (Lewicki, Alexander)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sun Hong Foods, Inc., upon Defendant David "Dave" Anderson served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lewicki, Alexander)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Writ of of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. The document(s) is missing proof of service upon defendant. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Writ of of Attachment and Right to Attach Order filed by plaintiff Sun Hong Foods, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 1/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jay Ding, #3 Declaration of Jason R. Klinowski, #4 Declaration of Kathryn S. Diemer, #5 Notice of Application and Hearing For, #6 Proposed Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment After Hearing, #7 Writ of Attachment) (Lewicki, Alexander)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants David "Dave" Anderson, William "Bill" Glaser, Outstanding Foods, Inc.. (dml)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (jtil)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sun Hong Foods, Inc. (Lewicki, Alexander)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sun Hong Foods, Inc.. (Lewicki, Alexander)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24856538 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Sun Hong Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Attorney Alexander J Lewicki added to party Sun Hong Foods, Inc. (pty:pla))(Lewicki, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Hong Foods, Inc. v. Outstanding Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Hong Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander J Lewicki
Represented By: Kathryn S Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William "Bill" Glaser
Represented By: Jacob Michael Harper
Represented By: James H Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David "Dave" Anderson
Represented By: Jacob Michael Harper
Represented By: James H Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outstanding Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Michael Harper
Represented By: James H Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?