Thermaltake Technology Co., Ltd. v. Phanteks USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD. and Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Phanteks USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10147
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc., (Wang, Gary)
January 20, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc..(Wang, Gary)
January 14, 2020 Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On January 9, 2020, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on January 13, 2020. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Phanteks USA Inc. answer now due 1/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc..(Attorney Gary F Wang added to party Phanteks USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Wang, Gary)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 1/23/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) Phanteks USA Inc. did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10147 AB(SKx). (rn)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-10147 CAS (SKx). (esa)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Cheng, Jamie)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Phanteks USA Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Che Shang Tang, Agent For Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cheng, Jamie)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Michael Wolak III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Thermaltake Technology Co., Ltd., designating Jamie M Cheng as local counsel. (sbou)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Wolak III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24889488) filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application Of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Cheng, Jamie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Phanteks USA Inc. (sbou)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.. (Cheng, Jamie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Wolak III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD., (Cheng, Jamie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24860831 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Attorney Jamie Mei Cheng added to party Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.(pty:pla))(Cheng, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thermaltake Technology Co., Ltd. v. Phanteks USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phanteks USA Inc.
Represented By: Gary F Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.
Represented By: Jamie Mei Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jamie Mei Cheng
Represented By: Michael Wolak, III
Represented By: Daniel A Solitro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?