Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC v. Bingemans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC and Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC doing business as See Tickets
Defendant: Bingemans, Inc., Beyond Oz Productions Inc and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv10150
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BINGEMANS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #20 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant Bingemans shall have up to and including February 10, 2020 to respond to See Ticket's Complaint. (bm)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 02/10/2020 filed by Defendant Bingemans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jeff W Poole added to party Bingemans, Inc.(pty:dft))(Poole, Jeff)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Beyond Oz Productions Inc. #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The clerk does not have the authority to enter default against a foreign entity. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. (bm)
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bingemans, Inc. answer now due 1/25/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC.(Akley, Benjamin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Beyond Oz Productions Inc filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC. (Akley, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC, upon Defendant Beyond Oz Productions Inc served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Mattachione, President in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akley, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC, upon Defendant Bingemans, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marissa Rockel, Supervisor in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akley, Benjamin)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Beyond Oz Productions Inc. (bm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Bingemans, Inc. (bm)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC. (Akley, Benjamin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC. (Akley, Benjamin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC, identifying Vivendi Holding I LLC; Vivendi SA. (Akley, Benjamin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC dba See Tickets. (Akley, Benjamin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC dba See Tickets. (Akley, Benjamin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC dba See Tickets. (Akley, Benjamin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24861270 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC dba See Tickets. (Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC dba See Tickets(pty:pla))(Akley, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC v. Bingemans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingemans, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff W Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyond Oz Productions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Represented By: Thomas H Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivendi Ticketing U.S. LLC doing business as See Tickets
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Represented By: Thomas H Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?