Soheyla Zoveidat v. Quality Loan Service Corporation
Plaintiff: Soheyla Zoveidat
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, EMC Mortgage Corporation, First American Title Company, John Matson, Michael Rodriguez, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Corporation, DOES 1 through 5, inclusive and All Persons Unknown
Case Number: 2:2019cv10152
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dailey, Steven)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #8 filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 29, #2 Proof of Service)(Dailey, Steven)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Dailey, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Dailey, Steven)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Dailey, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Steven M Dailey added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Dailey added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:dft)) (Dailey, Steven)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat, upon Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat, upon Defendant EMC Mortgage Corporation served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy. (bm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat, upon Defendant First American Title Company served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE UN-EXECUTED RE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat as to First American Title Company. (shb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE RE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat as to Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Corporation. Not signed/acknowledged, dated or signed by the defendant. (shb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat. (shb)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperi: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED without prejudice by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Reason: Inadequate showing of indigency. (bm)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10152 VAP(JCx). (rn)
December 4, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(klg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat. (jtil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat. (jtil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Soheyla Zoveidat against Defendants All Persons Unknown, Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, First American Title Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, John Matson, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Michael Rodriguez, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 CV71, #2 Summons Request) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soheyla Zoveidat v. Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Matson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Steven M Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 5, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soheyla Zoveidat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?