Kenneth Fox v. US Government
Plaintiff: Kenneth A Fox
Defendant: US Government
Case Number: 2:2019cv10350
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Gail J Standish
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Scheduling Conference set for March 2, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. This matter is set for a scheduling conference in Courtroom 9C, before the Honorable Dean D. Pregerson, located at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The conferencewill be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). Lead trial counsel shall attend the scheduling conference. (shb)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-00567 DDP(MAA). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10350 DDP(MAAx). Signed by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (rn)
January 21, 2020 Filing 27 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the preparation of a proposal pursuant to General Order 19-03 to transfer the present case to the judge who is handling a related lawsuit (i.e. Case No. 2:19-cv-00567), the scheduling conference now set for January 23, 2020 is continued to February 6, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. to await a decision as to whether that judge will accept the transfer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 15, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan counsel for Defendant US Government. Adding Matthew J. Barragan as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party US Government(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Defendant US Government.. (Barragan, Matthew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant US Government. Related Case(s): CV 19-10349-AB (PLAx); CV 19-00567-DDP (MAAx) (Barragan, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for January 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than January 13, 2020 (yl)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Oregon
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:19-cv-00874-YY, from U.S. District Court District of Oregon (Portland). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-10350-GW (GJSx). (lh)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/03/2019.) (pvh) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF #13 ) is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 12/03/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/03/2019.) (pvh) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Marco A. Hernandez to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/3/19.) (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Filed by US Government. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (Brown, Adrian) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to US Government served on 9/13/2019, answer due on 11/12/2019. Service specifically made upon U.S. Attorney General. (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to US Government served on 8/30/2019, answer due on 10/29/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to US Government (United States Attorney's Office and Attorney General). (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (re) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to US Government served on 7/15/2019, answer due on 9/13/2019. Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to US Government. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service. (re) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/20/2019.) (jp) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Kenneth A. Fox regarding Case Assignment Notice #4 . (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Kenneth A. Fox. (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Kenneth A. Fox against US Government (Attachments: #1 Attachment; #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sb). [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kenneth A. Fox. (sb) [Transferred from Oregon on 12/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Fox v. US Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Government
Represented By: Adrian L Brown
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?