In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Petitioner: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.
Appellee: California Department of Health Care Services and Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Debtor: Verity Medical Foundation, Verity Business Services, Verity Holdings, LLC, St. Francis Medical Center of Lynwood Foundation, St. Vincent Medical Center, De Paul Ventures-San Jose Dialysis, LLC, O'Connor Hospital Foundation, St. Vincent Dialysis Center, Inc., De Paul Ventures, LLC, St. Vincent Foundation, Seton Medical Center Foundation, Seton Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital Foundation and St. Francis Medical Center
Appellant: Strategic Global Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10354
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motions to Intervene #17 ; Order GRANTING Motion to Consolidate Appeals1. All further filings are to be made in CV 19-10352 DSF alone, and the Clerk is ordered to close cases CV 19-10354 and CV 19-10356. Consolidated briefs are to be filed in CV 19-10352 DSF following the schedule set out in the Court's 1/8/2020 order and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8000, et seq. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
January 15, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Debtors' Response to Strategic Global Management, Inc.'s Motion for Order Directing the Parties to: (1) Comply with General Order No. 11-10, Section 5, and District Court Local Rule 16-15; and (2) Participate in ADR Process filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Moyron, Tania)
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND #20 Debtors' Response to Strategic Global Management, Inc.'s Motion for Order Directing the Parties to: (1) Comply with General Order No. 11-10, Section 5, and District Court Local Rule 16-15; and (2) Participate in ADR Process filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Moyron, Tania)
January 15, 2020 Filing 24 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND #20 filed by Movant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.. (Behrens, James)
January 8, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 2/7/2020. (jp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal #2 . (jp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Gary E. Klausner in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND #20 filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
January 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Gary E Klausner added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a)) (Klausner, Gary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE Notice of Hearing on January 27, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. re: Motion to Intervene filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.. (Behrens, James)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Motion to Intervene #17 The Court sets the hearing on the motion for Monday, 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.. (Attorney James Cornell Behrens added to party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.(pty:bkmov)) (Behrens, James)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DKT. #13 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. [See Order for specifics.] (ake)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodgment of Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion to Dismiss Appeals re Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal Notice of Debtors' Emergency Motion to Dismiss Appeals #13 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moyron, Tania)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 APPENDIX filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc.. Re: Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal Notice of Debtors' Emergency Motion to Dismiss Appeals #13 Appendix In Support of Debtors' Emergency Motion to Dismiss Appeals (Attachments: #1 Appendix Tab 1, #2 Appendix Tab 2 (Part 1), #3 Appendix Tab 2 (Part 2), #4 Appendix Tab 2 (Part 3), #5 Appendix Tab 2 (Part 4), #6 Appendix Tab 3, #7 Appendix Tab 4 (Part 1), #8 Appendix Tab 4 (Part 2), #9 Appendix Tab 5, #10 Appendix Tab 6, #11 Appendix Tab 7, #12 Appendix Tab 8, #13 Appendix Tab 9, #14 Appendix Tab 10, #15 Appendix Tab 11, #16 Appendix Tab 12, #17 Appendix Tab 13, #18 Appendix Tab 14, #19 Appendix Tab 15, #20 Appendix Tab 16, #21 Appendix Tab 17, #22 Appendix Tab 18, #23 Appendix Tab 19, #24 Appendix Tab 20, #25 Appendix Tab 21, #26 Appendix Tab 22, #27 Appendix Tab 23, #28 Appendix Tab 24)(Moyron, Tania)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal Notice of Debtors' Emergency Motion to Dismiss Appeals filed by Appellees Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Moyron, Tania)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-10352 DSF. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10354 DSF. Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellees Verity Health System of California, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-10352; 2:19-cv-10356 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Moyron, Tania)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong counsel for Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Adding Jeffrey S. Kwong as counsel of record for Strategic Global Management, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a))(Kwong, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 (Attorney John-Patrick M Fritz added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a))(Fritz, John-Patrick)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . Document number 1 due to clerical error. The docket clerk enter the wrong text information and attached the wrong document to the entire image of the new action. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 U.S. BANKRUPTCY APPELLATE PANEL OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT TRANSMITTAL; Notice of transfer of appeal to district court; regarding BAP: CC-19-1311 (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT RE: ELECTION TO TRANSFER APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/2/2019. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/27/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 7] NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order (1) Finding that SGM is Obligated to Promptly Close the SGM Sale Under 8.6 of the APA, Provided that all other condition to closing have been satisfied and (2) Granting Debtors' Motion for a Continuance of the hearing to approve the disclosure statement entered on 11/18/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Ernest M Robles, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 11/18/2019., filed by appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc. (ghap) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/9/2019) (ghap). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 BK Docket Sheets) (ghap). Modified on 12/9/2019 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: California Department of Health Care Services
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Kenneth Kai-Chun Wang
Represented By: Jennifer M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas A Koffroth
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Verity Medical Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Verity Business Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Verity Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: St. Francis Medical Center of Lynwood Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: St. Vincent Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: De Paul Ventures-San Jose Dialysis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: O'Connor Hospital Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: St. Vincent Dialysis Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: De Paul Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: St. Vincent Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Seton Medical Center Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Seton Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: O'Connor Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Saint Louise Regional Hospital Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: St. Francis Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Strategic Global Management, Inc.
Represented By: John-Patrick M Fritz
Represented By: Gary E Klausner
Represented By: Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.
Represented By: Mark Shinderman
Represented By: Gregory Allan Bray
Represented By: James Cornell Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?