City of Los Angeles v. Federal Aviation Administration
Plaintiff: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv10506
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter J. Kirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff City of Los Angeles (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25272798) filed by Plaintiff City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Michaelson, David)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel H. Hunt APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs City of Los Angeles, designating David J. Michaelson as local counsel. (lt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel H. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff City of Los Angeles (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25233517) filed by Plaintiff City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Michaelson, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed City of Los Angeles, upon Defendant Federal Aviation Administration served on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Michaelson, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff City of Los Angeles, upon Defendant Federal Aviation Administration served on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Michaelson, David)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Federal Aviation Administration answer now due 2/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration.(Attorney Jason K Axe added to party Federal Aviation Administration(pty:dft))(Axe, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. It should have been filed and entered separately under its proper event. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (et)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (et)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CITY OF LOS ANGELES, identifying City of Los Angeles. (Michaelson, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Michaelson, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24939541 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney David J Michaelson added to party CITY OF LOS ANGELES(pty:pla))(Michaelson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Los Angeles v. Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Jason K Axe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: David J Michaelson
Represented By: Nathaniel H Hunt
Represented By: Peter J Kirsch
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?