White Shadows LLC v. Luke Hemmings et al
Plaintiff: White Shadows LLC
Defendant: Louis Bell, 5SOS LLP, Ali Tamposi, Andrew Wotman, Ashton Irwin, Emi April Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Michael Clifford, 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, Apple Inc, Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc, Luke Hemmings, UMG Recordings Inc, Capitol Records LLC, Calum Hood, Vevo LLC, One Mode Productions Limited, Reservoir Media Management Inc, Spotify U.S.A, Inc., Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc doing business as Songs of Kobalt Music Publishing and Reservoir Media Management Inc doing business as Reservoir 416
Case Number: 2:2019cv10524
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc, Reservoir Media Management Inc, Ali Tamposi, Andrew Wotman, (Aronoff, David)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: GRANTING #61 #64 Non-Resident Attorney Lindsey L. Robin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Apple Inc, designating Harrison J. Dossick as local counsel. (shb)
January 31, 2020 Filing 64 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lindsey L. Robin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/29/2020, Receipt No. 26N6N5OK) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Letter Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Dossick, Harrison)
January 31, 2020 Filing 63 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lindsey L. Robin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25219964) #61 by Clerk of Court. Correct incomplete proposed order by 2/3/20.. (shb)
January 30, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lindsey L. Robin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25219964) #61 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order incomplete. Firm address missing from document. (lt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 61 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lindsey L. Robin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25219964) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Letter Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Dossick, Harrison)
January 29, 2020 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Apple Inc, identifying Plaintiff White Shadows LLC; Defendant Luke Hemmings; Defendant Calum Hood; Defendant Ashton Irwin; Defendant Michael Clifford; Defendant Louis Bell; Defendant Andrew Wotman; Defendant Ali Tamposi; Defendant 5 Seconds of Summer LLP; Defendant 5SOS LLP; Defendant One Mode Productions Limited; Defendant Reservoir Media Management Inc d/b/a Reservoir 416; Defendant Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc. d/b/a Songs of Kobalt Music Publishing; Defendant Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Defendant Emi April Music, Inc.; Defendant Capitol Records, LLC; Defendant UMG Recordings Inc; Defendant Vevo LLC; Defendant Spotify U.S.A., Inc.; and Defendant Apple Inc.. (Dossick, Harrison)
January 29, 2020 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Harrison J Dossick counsel for Defendant Apple Inc. Adding Harrison J. Dossick as counsel of record for Defendant, Apple Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attorney Harrison J Dossick added to party Apple Inc(pty:dft))(Dossick, Harrison)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, GRANTING Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, #55 . Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint on or before February 12, 2020. This Order supersedes the Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution {Dkt 51}. (shb)
January 28, 2020 Filing 57 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiff White Shadows LLC(Larson, Arnold)
January 27, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 24, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (on or before January 29, 2020) and Response Thereto (on or before February 12, 2020) filed by Defendants 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify U.S.A, Inc., UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Re Filing of Amended Complaint and Response Thereto and OSC Re Dismissal #51 )(Weingarten, Alex)
January 23, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Aronoff on behalf of Defendants Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc, Reservoir Media Management Inc, Ali Tamposi, Andrew Wotman (Attorney David Aronoff added to party Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David Aronoff added to party Reservoir Media Management Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David Aronoff added to party Ali Tamposi(pty:dft), Attorney David Aronoff added to party Andrew Wotman(pty:dft))(Aronoff, David)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: GRANTING #47 Non-Resident Attorney John F. Rabe APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff White Shadows LLC, designating A. Drew Larson as local counsel. (shb)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: GRANTING #46 Non-Resident Attorney Brad J. Davidson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, White Shadows LLC, designating A. Drew Larson as local counsel. (shb)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 29, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer by the defendant(s) or plaintiff's request for entry of default. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oralargument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (shb)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 6, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin S Akley on behalf of Defendants Louis Bell, Emi April Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Louis Bell(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Emi April Music Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Sony/ATV Songs LLC(pty:dft))(Akley, Benjamin)
December 26, 2019 Filing 47 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John F. Rabe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff White Shadows LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25015786) filed by Plaintiff White Shadows LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Larson, Arnold)
December 26, 2019 Filing 46 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brad J. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff White Shadows LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25015325) filed by Plaintiff White Shadows LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Arnold Drew Larson added to party White Shadows LLC(pty:pla)) (Larson, Arnold)
December 19, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin W Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
December 19, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jay K Rutherford on behalf of Defendants 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify U.S.A, Inc., UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
December 19, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jay K Rutherford. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
December 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John F Rabe Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
December 19, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brad J Davidson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
December 19, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
December 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:19-cv-01693-S, from Northern District of Texas (Dallas). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-10524-DDP (PLAx). (ghap)
December 19, 2019 Filing 37 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Northern
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/12/2019) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 35 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Central District of California filed by 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify USA Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weingarten, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spotify USA Inc, UMG Recordings Inc and Vevo LLC answer due 12/20/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/5/2019) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 33 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint to December 20, 2019 and Status Report Regarding Transfer of Venue to the Central District of California filed by 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify USA Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weingarten, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court grants [ECF No. 27] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel M. Bressi (Applicant). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/20/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court grants [ECF No. 26] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex M. Weingarten (Applicant). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/20/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court grants [ECF No. 25] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey K. Logan (Applicant). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/20/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. 5 Seconds of Summer LLP answer due 12/4/2019; 5SOS LLP answer due 12/4/2019; Apple Inc answer due 12/4/2019; Capitol Records LLC answer due 12/4/2019; Michael Clifford answer due 12/4/2019; EMI April Music Inc answer due 12/4/2019; Luke Hemmings answer due 12/4/2019; Calum Hood answer due 12/4/2019; Ashton Irwin answer due 12/4/2019; Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc answer due 12/4/2019; One Mode Productions Limited answer due 12/4/2019; Reservoir Media Management Inc answer due 12/4/2019; Sony/ATV Songs LLC answer due 12/4/2019; Spotify USA Inc answer due 12/4/2019; Ali Tamposi answer due 12/4/2019; UMG Recordings Inc answer due 12/4/2019; Vevo LLC answer due 12/4/2019; Andrew Wotman answer due 12/4/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/19/2019) (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: If such service is not accomplished by 12/19/2019, the claims against Defendant Louis Bell will be subject to dismissal without prejudice and without further notice, absent good cause shown. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/19/2019) (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10422323) filed by 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify USA Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party 5 Seconds of Summer LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party 5SOS LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party Capitol Records LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party Michael Clifford(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party Luke Hemmings(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party Calum Hood(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party Ashton Irwin(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party One Mode Productions Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party Spotify USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party UMG Recordings Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Michele Bressi added to party Vevo LLC(pty:dft) (Bressi, Rachel) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10413699) filed by 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify USA Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party 5 Seconds of Summer LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party 5SOS LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party Capitol Records LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party Michael Clifford(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party Luke Hemmings(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party Calum Hood(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party Ashton Irwin(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party One Mode Productions Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party Spotify USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party UMG Recordings Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Alex M Weingarten added to party Vevo LLC(pty:dft) (Weingarten, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10413653) filed by 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify USA Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party 5 Seconds of Summer LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party 5SOS LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party Capitol Records LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party Michael Clifford(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party Luke Hemmings(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party Calum Hood(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party Ashton Irwin(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party One Mode Productions Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party Spotify USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party UMG Recordings Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey K Logan added to party Vevo LLC(pty:dft) (Logan, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vevo LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sony Music Entertainment Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Universal Music Group, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sony Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Vivendi SA, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Google, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ADMC US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc. for Vevo LLC. (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 5SOS LLP identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate One Mode Productions Limited for 5SOS LLP. (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capitol Records LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Vivendi SA for Capitol Records LLC. (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by One Mode Productions Limited identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Modest Management Limited for One Mode Productions Limited. (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spotify USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Spotify AB for Spotify USA Inc. (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 5 Seconds of Summer LLP. (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UMG Recordings Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Vivendi SA for UMG Recordings Inc. (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, One Mode Productions Limited, Spotify USA Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party 5 Seconds of Summer LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party 5SOS LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party Capitol Records LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party Michael Clifford(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party Luke Hemmings(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party Calum Hood(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party Ashton Irwin(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party One Mode Productions Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party Spotify USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party UMG Recordings Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party Vevo LLC(pty:dft) (Rutherford, Jay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Apple Inc ; served on 10/18/2019. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Spotify USA Inc answer due 11/15/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/25/2019) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. EMI April Music Inc answer due 11/15/2019; Sony/ATV Songs LLC answer due 11/15/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/24/2019) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Spotify filed by White Shadows LLC (Davidson, Brad) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by EMI April Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kevin W Brown added to party EMI April Music Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Brown added to party Sony/ATV Songs LLC(pty:dft) (Brown, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Capitol Records LLC ; served on 10/4/2019; Reservoir Media Management Inc ; served on 10/4/2019; Spotify USA Inc ; served on 10/4/2019; UMG Recordings Inc ; served on 10/4/2019; Vevo LLC ; served on 10/4/2019. (sre) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to EMI April Music Inc ; served on 10/4/2019. (sre) Modified file date on 10/10/2019 (sre). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sony/ATV Songs LLC. Waiver sent on 8/7/2019. (Davidson, Brad) Modified date waiver sent on 9/12/2019 (dsr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Brad) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, Apple Inc, Louis Bell, Capitol Records LLC, Michael Clifford, EMI April Music Inc, Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc, One Mode Productions Limited, Reservoir Media Management Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spotify USA Inc, Ali Tamposi, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC, Andrew Wotman. (aaa) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/17/2019) (mla). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John F. Rabe Jr. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2019) (aaa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John F. Rabe, Jr. (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10117145) filed by White Shadows, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Davidson, Brad) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by White Shadows, LLC. (Davidson, Brad) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Luke Hemmings, Calum Hood, Ashton Irwin, Michael Clifford, Louis Bell, Andrew Wotman, Ali Tamposi, 5 Seconds of Summer LLP, 5SOS LLP, One Mode Productions Limited, Reservoir Media Management Inc, Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EMI April Music Inc, Capitol Records LLC, UMG Recordings Inc, Vevo LLC, Spotify USA Inc, Apple Inc filed by White Shadows LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10117145) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Davidson, Brad) Modified on 7/16/2019 (aaa). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Shadows LLC v. Luke Hemmings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Bell
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5SOS LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Tamposi
Represented By: Conrad Brently Wilton
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wotman
Represented By: Conrad Brently Wilton
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Irwin
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emi April Music Inc
Represented By: Kevin W Brown
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Kevin W Brown
Represented By: Benjamin S Akley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Clifford
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 Seconds of Summer LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Harrison J Dossick
Represented By: Lindsey L Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc
Represented By: Conrad Brently Wilton
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Hemmings
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Records LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calum Hood
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vevo LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Mode Productions Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reservoir Media Management Inc
Represented By: Conrad Brently Wilton
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify U.S.A, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Rachel M Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc doing business as Songs of Kobalt Music Publishing
Represented By: Conrad Brently Wilton
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reservoir Media Management Inc doing business as Reservoir 416
Represented By: Conrad Brently Wilton
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Shadows LLC
Represented By: Brad J Davidson
Represented By: John F Rabe, Jr
Represented By: Arnold Drew Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?