Supima v. Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Supima
Defendant: Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10568
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Supima, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #20 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 21 served on 02/03/2020. (King, Anthony)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (DKT. #18 ) AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (DKT. #19 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motions from May 4, 2020 to May 11, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Because Defendant has not yet made an appearance in this action, Plaintiff is ordered to serve this Order and the Order Setting Rule 16(b)/26(f) Scheduling Conference (Dkt. #20 ) on Plaintiff and file a proof of service no later than February 3, 2020.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/1/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from and to Confirm Arbitration Award ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Supima. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order) (King, Anthony)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:15-cv-08048-JAK-RAO, filed by Plaintiff Supima. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (King, Anthony)
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Order re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Concerning Supima's Motion for Alternative Service of Process #15 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Anthony)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE RELIEF CONCERNING SUPIMAS MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS (DKT. #15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the following deficiency(ies) has been found with your electronically filed document: Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re..." with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by January 29, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Concerning Supima's Motion for Alternative Service of Process filed by plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of King ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #2 Exhibit 1 to King Decl ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #3 Exhibit 2 to King Decl ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #4 Exhibit 3 to King Decl ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #5 PROPOSED Motion for Alternative Service of Process; Memo of Ps__As, #6 Declaration of King ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #7 Exhibit 1 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #8 Exhibit 2 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #9 Exhibit 3 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #10 Exhibit 4 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process) (King, Anthony)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Anthony T. King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Supima, designating Patrick W. Kelly as local counsel. (es)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, GRANTING #10 Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Hauff APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Supima, designating Patrick W. Kelly as local counsel. (es)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony T. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Supima (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25040492) filed by plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Patrick)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Hauff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Supima (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25040486) filed by plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Patrick)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-08048 JAK(RAOx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Fernando M. Olguin to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10568 JAK(RAOx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd. (et)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Supima. Related Case(s): LA CV15-08048 JAK (RAOx) (Kelly, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Supima, identifying Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.. (Kelly, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Supima. (Kelly, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Supima. (Kelly, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24951264 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Supima(pty:pla))(Kelly, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supima v. Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supima
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Charles F Hauff
Represented By: Anthony T King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?