Yaakov Markel v. Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America et al
Plaintiff: YAAKOV MARKEL
Defendant: Nachum Rabinowitz, an individual, DOES 1-100,, UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, a corporation, Nachum Rabinowitz, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2019cv10704
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. COURT ORDER TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS #7 OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for February 3, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. The Court will reset the motion should it deem necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, re Reply (Motion related) #11 , Request for Judicial Notice, #12 , Declaration (Motion related), #13 served on 1/17/2020. (Schloss, Leonora)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of KEVIN D. FINLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schloss, Leonora)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schloss, Leonora)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. (Schloss, Leonora)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Plaintiff Yaakov Markel. (Dickerman, William)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. correcting Request for Judicial Notice #8 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Schloss, Leonora)
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Defendant Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. (Schloss, Leonora)
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin D. Finley in Support of Defendant Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint), #3 Exhibit B (Email dated 12/23/19), #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Schloss, Leonora)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
December 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, Nachum Rabinowitz, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Yaakov Markel. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/27/2019 SUMBITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, an individual, UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, a corporation (Schloss, Leonora)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, an individual, UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, a corporation, (Schloss, Leonora)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, an individual, UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, a corporation. (Schloss, Leonora)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Central District, case number 19STCV34831 Receipt No: 0973-24979214 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Nachum Rabinowitz, an individual, UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, a corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin D. Finley in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #3 Declaration of Lenny Bessler in Supoort of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332, #4 Declaration of Nachum Rabinowitz in Supoort of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332) (Attorney Leonora M Schloss added to party Nachum Rabinowitz, an individual(pty:dft), Attorney Leonora M Schloss added to party UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, a corporation(pty:dft))(Schloss, Leonora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yaakov Markel v. Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAAKOV MARKEL
Represented By: William Dickerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nachum Rabinowitz, an individual
Represented By: Leonora M Schloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, a corporation
Represented By: Leonora M Schloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nachum Rabinowitz
Represented By: Leonora M Schloss
Represented By: Kevin David Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Represented By: Leonora M Schloss
Represented By: Kevin David Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?