Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv10728
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-10728 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez. (Leland, Judith)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leland, Judith)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (mba)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (mba)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (mba)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez, identifying Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez. (Leland, Judith)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez. (Leland, Judith)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez. (Leland, Judith)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez. (Leland, Judith)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez. (Attorney Judith S Leland added to party Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez(pty:pla))(Leland, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Gutierrez Gutierrez
Represented By: Judith S Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?