The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc. et al v. AquaChile, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc. and DHBrands Limited
Defendant: Empresas Aquachile S.A., Agrosuper S.A. and AquaChile, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10733
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney EDWARD U. IBEH to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Agrosuper S.A., AquaChile, Inc., Empresas Aquachile S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25336390) filed by Defendants Agrosuper S.A., AquaChile, Inc., Empresas Aquachile S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Corley, Kanika)
February 14, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney NAIM S. SURGEON to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Agrosuper S.A., AquaChile, Inc., Empresas Aquachile S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25336329) filed by Defendants Agrosuper S.A., AquaChile, Inc., Empresas Aquachile S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Corley, Kanika)
February 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant AquaChile, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Aquachile, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of Naim S. Surgeon (with Exhibit A), #4 Proposed Order)(Corley, Kanika)
February 14, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Agrosuper S.A., Empresas Aquachile S.A.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #22 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Joint Motion and Joint Motion of Defendants Agrosuper S.A. and Empresas Aquachille S.A. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of Naim S. Surgeon (with Exhibit A), #4 Declaration of Edward U. Ibeh, #5 Exhibit A to Ibeh Decl, #6 Exhibit B to Ibeh Decl., #7 Proposed Order)(Corley, Kanika)
February 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Empresas Aquachile S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant Aquachile, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO its Motion to Dismiss) (Corley, Kanika)
February 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants Agrosuper S.A., AquaChile, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Corley, Kanika)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (More than 30 days), #14 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. STIPULATION AND ORDERS IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Service of the summons and Complaint in this action was effective on each one of the Defendants on December 24, 2019. 2. The Defendants time to respond to the Complaint in this action is extended until February 13, 2020.FURTHER EXTENSION DISFAVORED. Defendants Agrosuper S.A. answer due 2/13/2020; AquaChile, Inc. answer due 2/13/2020; Empresas Aquachile S.A. answer due 2/13/2020 (shb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., DHBrands Limited, upon Defendant Agrosuper S.A. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, David)
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., DHBrands Limited, upon Defendant AquaChile, Inc. served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Giselle Cordoves, Legal Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, David)
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., DHBrands Limited, upon Defendant Agrosuper S.A. served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, David)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., DHBrands Limited, upon Defendant Empresas Aquachile S.A. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, David)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiffs' Second Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DHBrands Limited, The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., (Tajmiri, Ghazal)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10733 RSWL(JEMx). (rn)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 18, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Agrosuper S.A., AquaChile, Inc., Empresas Aquachile S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kanika D Corley added to party Agrosuper S.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Kanika D Corley added to party AquaChile, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kanika D Corley added to party Empresas Aquachile S.A.(pty:dft))(Corley, Kanika)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10733 CBM(JEMx). (rn)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff DHBrands Limited, The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., (Thomas, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Empresas Aquachile S.A. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Agrosuper S.A. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant AquaChile, Inc. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DHBrands Limited, The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., (Thomas, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs DHBrands Limited, The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc.. (Thomas, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff DHBrands Limited, The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc.. (Thomas, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff DHBrands Limited, The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc.. (Thomas, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff DHBrands Limited, The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc.. (Thomas, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/19/2019, receipt number 26M94J11), filed by Plaintiff The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc., DHBrands Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney David A Thomas added to party DHBrands Limited(pty:pla), Attorney David A Thomas added to party The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc.(pty:pla))(Thomas, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc. et al v. AquaChile, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empresas Aquachile S.A.
Represented By: Kanika D Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agrosuper S.A.
Represented By: Kanika D Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AquaChile, Inc.
Represented By: Kanika D Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Santa Barbara Smokehouse, Inc.
Represented By: David A Thomas
Represented By: Ghazal Tajmiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHBrands Limited
Represented By: David A Thomas
Represented By: Ghazal Tajmiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?