Claudia Chavez v. LAC and USC Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Chavez
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,, Los Angeles County Department of Health Services, LAC+USC Medical Center, The County of Los Angeles and LAC USC Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv10735
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. (cw)
February 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The County of Los Angeles, (Reback, Robert)
February 10, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The County of Los Angeles.(Reback, Robert)
February 6, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The County of Los Angeles answer now due 2/10/2020, filed by defendant The County of Los Angeles.(Attorney Robert C Reback added to party The County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Reback, Robert)
January 28, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caroline E Jackson counsel for Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. Adding Caroline E. Jackson as counsel of record for Claudia Chavez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. (Attorney Caroline E Jackson added to party Claudia Chavez(pty:pla))(Jackson, Caroline)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez, upon Defendant LAC USC Medical Center served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LAC+USC Medical Center in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Winter, Jessica)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant LAC USC Medical Center. (jp)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. (Winter, Jessica)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver was issued 12/23/2019. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez, upon Defendant The County of Los Angeles served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Winter, Jessica)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez, upon Defendant Los Angeles County Department of Health Services served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Winter, Jessica)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. (Winter, Jessica)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The County of Los Angeles. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles County Department of Health Services. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jessica Winter counsel for Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. Adding Jessica Winter as counsel of record for Claudia Chavez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jessica Winter. (Attorney Jessica Winter added to party Claudia Chavez(pty:pla))(Winter, Jessica)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. (Ells, Lisa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. (Ells, Lisa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez, (Ells, Lisa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. (Ells, Lisa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24985693 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Claudia Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Lisa Ells added to party Claudia Chavez(pty:pla))(Ells, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claudia Chavez v. LAC and USC Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Department of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAC+USC Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Robert C Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAC USC Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Chavez
Represented By: Lisa Ells
Represented By: Michael W Bien
Represented By: Caroline E Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?