Joseph Foord v. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Joseph Foord
Respondent: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and Does 1 through 30, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv10794
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 37 Application for Refund denied. Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid #21 . (rdj)
February 6, 2020 Filing 36 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 02/05/2020 to Thomas Kaufman for payment made on 12/31/2019 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter N. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039215) #12 #18 . (rdj)
February 5, 2020 Filing 35 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 02/05/2020 to Thomas Kaufman for payment made on 12/31/2019 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian A. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039198) #11 #17 . (rdj)
January 27, 2020 Filing 34 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge Percy Anderson, #33 . In accordance with the Court's January 27, 2020 Minute Order denying Joseph Foord's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Remand for Rehearing, it is HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: 1. The arbitration award in favor of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and against Joseph Foord, dated November 19, 2019, is confirmed in all respects; and 2. Foord is ordered to pay to Halliburton the sum of $40,669.30 in costs incurred by Halliburton, as directed by the Arbitration Award. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Before the Court is a Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Remand for Rehearing filed by Joseph Foord ("Foord"). (Docket No. 10 ("Mot"). Foord seeks to vacate the award from an arbitration proceeding he participated in against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. ("Halliburton"). Halliburton has filed an Opposition, and Foord has filed a Reply. (Docket Nos. 19, 21.) Halliburton has also filed a Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. (Docket No. 1.) Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for January 27, 2020, is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. For the reasons discussed below, the Court denies Foord's Motion. The Court hereby confirms the arbitration award. (See document for details). The Court denies Foord's Motion to Vacate and Remand. The Court hereby confirms the arbitration award that Foord take nothing on his claims and Halliburton is awarded reasonable costs in the amount of $40,669.30. The Court will issue a Judgment consistent with this Order, which will resolve both Case No. 19-10481 (MAAx) and Case No. 19-10794 PA (MAAx) in their entirety. (mrgo)
January 24, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE Respondent Halliburton Energy Services Inc.'s Notice of Petitioner's Executed Release and Impact on Pending Motions filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annette A. Idalski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25056050) #27 filed by Respondent, Halliburton Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying #27 Non-Resident Attorney Annette A. Idalski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of respondent Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (mrgo)
January 8, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Petition (case opening), RESPONDENT HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC.S RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS COMPLAINT TO CORRECT AND VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Kaufman, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annette A. Idalski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039490) #13 filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas) Modified on 2/5/2020 (lmh).
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annette A. Idalski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25056050) filed by Respondent, Halliburton Energy Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Denying #15 Non-Resident Attorney Peter N. Hall APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Terming Attorney Peter N Hall. (et)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Denying #13 Non-Resident Attorney Annette A. Idalski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Terming Attorney Annette A Idalski. (et)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Denying #11 Non-Resident Attorney Brian A. Smith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (et)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas) Modified on 2/5/2020 (lmh).
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter N. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039866) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annette A. Idalski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039490) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian A Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039530) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
January 2, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter N. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039215) #12 filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas) Modified on 2/5/2020 (lmh).
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian A. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039198) #11 filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas) Modified on 2/5/2020 (lmh).
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64), #12 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64), #11 filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter N. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039866) filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian A Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039530) filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annette A. Idalski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039490) filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter N. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039215) filed by Petitioner Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian A. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25039198) filed by Petitioner Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-010481 PA(MAAx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10794 PA(MAAx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian A Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter N Hall. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Annette A Idalski. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
December 20, 2019 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ATTACHMENT TO ADR-106, SECTIONS 10(b) (2), AND 10(c) (2); COMPLAINT TO CORRECT AND VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD against Defendants Does 1 through, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., filed by petitioner Joseph Foord. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
December 20, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PETITION filed against Does, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Petition to Correct Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award.(Filing fee $ 400.), filed by petitioner Joseph Foord. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCP05113 Receipt No: 0973-24998315 - Fee: $400, filed by Respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Thomas R Kaufman added to party Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.(pty:res))(Kaufman, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Foord v. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Foord
Represented By: Matthew X Oster
Represented By: Michael Alexander Sigall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R Kaufman
Represented By: Brian A Smith
Represented By: Annette A Idalski
Represented By: Peter N Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Does 1 through 30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?