Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Inc. et al v. M/V CMA CGM New Jersey, et al
Plaintiff: YETI Coolers, LLC, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc. and Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Inc.
Defendant: M/V CMA CGM New Jersey and Mainfreight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10828
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Inc., upon Defendant Mainfreight, Inc. served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cynthia Martinez, General Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Matthews, Arturo)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants M/V CMA CGM New Jersey, Mainfreight, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Inc.(Matthews, Arturo)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pbl)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Mainfreight, Inc. (esa)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc., YETI Coolers, LLC. (Matthews, Arturo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT YETI Coolers, LLC filed by Plaintiff YETI Coolers, LLC identifying YETI Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Matthews, Arturo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Starr Indemnity & Liability Company filed by Plaintiffs Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc., YETI Coolers, LLC identifying Starr International Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Matthews, Arturo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc., YETI Coolers, LLC. (Matthews, Arturo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25005348 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc., YETI Coolers, LLC. (Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party YETI Coolers, LLC(pty:pla))(Matthews, Arturo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Inc. et al v. M/V CMA CGM New Jersey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V CMA CGM New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainfreight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YETI Coolers, LLC
Represented By: Arturo E Matthews, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc.
Represented By: Arturo E Matthews, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Inc.
Represented By: Arturo E Matthews, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?