Gerald McKean v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Gerald McKean
Defendant: DOES 1 through 70, inclusive, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, Does 1 through 70 inclusive and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10840
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Rahmanpour, Roya)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, Notice to State Court Clerk and Adverse Party of Removal in the United States District Court for the Central District of California served on December 23, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rahmanpour, Roya)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,.(Rahmanpour, Roya)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on December 24, 2019. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
December 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 THROUGH 70, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Plaintiff Gerald McKean. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/20/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19SMCV02044 Receipt No: 0973-25007181 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Roya Rahmanpour added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,(pty:dft))(Rahmanpour, Roya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerald McKean v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 70, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Represented By: Roya Rahmanpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 70 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Roya Rahmanpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald McKean
Represented By: James R Selth
Represented By: Daniel J Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?