Design Collection, Inc. v. High Secret Apparel Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Design Collection, Inc.
Defendant: High Secret Apparel Corp., Meredith Corp., SC Corporation, DOES 1 through 10 and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10853
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 18 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Dismissal) (mrgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.to Order to Show Cause, #15 (Doniger, Stephen)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES- Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before 2/3/2020, why this action should not be dismissed, as to High Secret Apparel Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and Meredith Corp., for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. (et)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to SC Corporation. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant SC Corporation served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Meredith Corp. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gaines\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant High Secret Apparel Corp. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Saman Naimian\Authorized Agent for Service of Process in c/o K. Sorarian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (et)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants SC Corporation, High Secret Apparel Corp., Meredith Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (et)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25009916 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Design Collection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Collection, Inc. v. High Secret Apparel Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Collection, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: David Shein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Secret Apparel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?