Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. v. Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-200, inclusive, Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC, Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC and Draco Cornelious Rosa
Case Number: 2:2019cv10957
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. The document is stricken. See Notice to Filer of Deficiencies filed 02/20/20 #24 . (cch)
February 20, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Hearing information is missing. (2) No Entry of Default on file; (3) Proposed Default Judgment Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 *STRICKEN* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Statement) (Tavera, Leonard) Modified on 2/21/2020 (cch).
February 13, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Draco Cornelious Rosa served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Tavera, Leonard)
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jane Amy Becker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/4/2020, Receipt No. 26NALST7) filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Proposed Order) (Tavera, Leonard)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jane Amy Becker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/4/2020, Receipt No. 26NALST7) #19 , for the following reasons: (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (jp)
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 2/11/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jane Amy Becker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/4/2020, Receipt No. 26NALST7) filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate) (Tavera, Leonard). Modified on 2/11/2020 (jp).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jane A. Becker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25257274) #17 , for the following reasons: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (jp)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 2/7/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #18 ] - APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jane A. Becker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25257274) filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Tavera, Leonard). Modified on 2/7/2020 (jp).
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice only as to Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC. (Tavera, Leonard)
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/14/2020; Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tavera, Leonard)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Draco Cornelious Rosa, Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC, Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC. (jp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Tavera, Leonard)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Tavera, Leonard)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Miscellaneous Document #8 . The following error(s) was found: Correct event is : Summons Request. (Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons in a Civil Action re: Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Miscellaneous Document #3 (Tavera, Leonard)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. Notice of Interested Parties (Tavera, Leonard)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Tavera, Leonard)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Tavera, Leonard)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25035707 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.. (Attorney Leonard M Tavera added to party Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Tavera, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc. v. Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emporio Group Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard M Tavera
Represented By: Jane A Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-200, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phantom Vox Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draco Cornelious Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?