Clifton Kerr v. Wilmington Trust N.A. et al
Petitioner: Clifton Kerr
Respondent: MERS Corp Holdings Inc and Wilmington Trust N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10973
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Petition #9 , #10 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Per Local Rule 7.1-1, counsel shall immediately file the Certificate of Interested Parties. (iv)
February 5, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MERS Corp Holdings Inc, Wilmington Trust N.A., (Baumann, Katalina)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: William Trust N.A.'s Answer to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award #9 , and Merscorp Corp. Holdings Inc's Answer to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award #10 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The documents are accepted as filed. Counsel are instructed to file a Notice of Interested Parties no later than close of business today. (L.R. 7.1-1) (vv)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Petition (case opening) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Petition (case opening) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Petition (case opening) #1 filed by Defendant MERS Corp Holdings Inc.(Attorney Katalina Baumann added to party MERS Corp Holdings Inc(pty:res))(Baumann, Katalina)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Petition (case opening) #1 filed by Defendant Wilmington Trust N.A..(Attorney Katalina Baumann added to party Wilmington Trust N.A.(pty:res))(Baumann, Katalina)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clifton Kerr, upon Defendant Wilmington Trust N.A. served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rose Lista-Authorized to Accept, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Wilmington Trust N.A. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (gk)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clifton Kerr, upon Defendant MERS CORP Holdings, Inc. served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joe Patry, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of MERS CORP Holdings, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (gk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (case opening) #1 as to Respondents MERS Corp Holdings Inc, Wilmington Trust N.A. (ghap)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Clifton Kerr. (ghap)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed against MERS Corp Holdings Inc, Wilmington Trust N.A. (Filing fee $ 400: PAID.), filed by petitioner Clifton Kerr. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton Kerr v. Wilmington Trust N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifton Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MERS Corp Holdings Inc
Represented By: Katalina Baumann
Represented By: Justin D Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wilmington Trust N.A.
Represented By: Katalina Baumann
Represented By: Justin D Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?