Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc et al v. Center for Medical Progress et al
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc, Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast, Planned Parenthood Rocky Mountains, Planned Parenthood of Santa Barbara, Ventura and San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc., Planned Parenhood Orange and San Bernardino Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood Pasadena and San Gabriel Valley, Inc., Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc., Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest, Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc., Planned Parenthood Los Angeles and Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc. doing business as Planned Parenthood Northern California
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Albin Rhomberg, Unknown Co-Conspirators, David Daleiden, Phillip S. Cronin, Sandra Susan Merritt, Gerardo Adrian Lopez, Troy Newman, Robert Sarkis and Susan Tennenbaum
Respondent: Deborah Nucatola
Case Number: 2:2019mc00007
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES OF HEARING ON MOVANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL #1 held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: Case called. Counsel made their appearances. The Court heard argument from counsel. For reasons stated on the record, the Court determined that it had jurisdiction to consider the Motion to Compel ("Motion") and granted in part and denied in part. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Court Recorder: CS 2-12-19. (klg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sharon Douglass Mayo counsel for Plaintiffs Planned Parenhood Orange and San Bernardino Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc, Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast, Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc., Planned Parenthood Pasadena and San Gabriel Valley, Inc., Planned Parenthood Rocky Mountains, Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc., Planned Parenthood of Santa Barbara, Ventura and San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest. JEE YOUNG YOU is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., et al.. (Mayo, Sharon)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Peter Breen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Center for Medical Progress, BioMax Procurement Services, LLC, and David Daleiden, designating Catherine W. Short as local counsel. (sbou)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter Breen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/7/2019, Receipt No. 26F9KHE3) filed by Defendant Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (LiMandri, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Defendant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/7/2019, Receipt No. 26F #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Defendant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/7/2019, Receipt No. 26F9KHE3) filed by Defendant Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (LiMandri, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian RE PENDING APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4, every attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must designate as Local Counsel an attorney who, among other things, maintains an office within the Central District of California. Although the Application designates as Local Counsel an attorney who attests that he "maintain[s] an office in the Central District of California for the practice of law," the only address provided for such attorney is a post office box in Rancho Santa Fe a city which is within the Southern, not the Central District of California. In light of the foregoing, the Applicant is directed forthwith to supplement the Application with either the address of the office maintained by the proposed Local Counsel in the Central District of California, or, if none, a designation of an alternative Local Counsel who meets the criteria set forth in Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4. The Court will defer ruling on the Application until the earlier of compliance with the instant order or February 12, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. #11 (klg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter Breen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23177537) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application. (lt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Electronic Filing re Supplement(Motion related) #8 , Notice of Appearance #9 , Supplement(Motion related) #10 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter Breen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23177537) #11 e-mailed to Amy L Bomse at amy.bonse@arnoldporter.com bounced due to 5.1.1 - Bad destination email address 'reject'. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to amy.bomse@aporter.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter Breen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23177537) filed by Defendant Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (LiMandri, Charles)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to #1 Motion to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena in N.D. Cal. Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 filed by Respondent Deborah Nucatola. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jura, Perlette)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Perlette Michele Jura on behalf of Respondent Deborah Nucatola (Attorney Perlette Michele Jura added to party Deborah Nucatola(pty:res))(Jura, Perlette)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena Served on Deborah Nucatola in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 #1 filed by Defendant Center for Medical Progress. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DOCUMENT SUBPOENA SERVED ON DEBORAH NUCATOLA re MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena Served on Deborah Nucatola in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 #1 filed by Defendant Center for Medical Progress. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena Served on Deborah Nucatola in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 #1 filed by Defendant Center for Medical Progress. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to compel compliance with Subpoena by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena Served on Deborah Nucatola in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 #1 is set for hearing. Set for hearing on 2/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (esa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
January 15, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new miscellaneous case. Receipt No. 0973-23045415 for $47 filing fee. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (esa)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena Served on Deborah Nucatola in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 filed by Defendant Center for Medical Progress. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Bracht, #2 Declaration of Paul Jonna, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Paul Jonna, #4 Exhibits 2-5 to Declaration of Paul Jonna, #5 Exhibits 6-7 to Declaration of Paul Jonna, #6 Exhibits 8-12 to Declaration of Paul Jonna, #7 Joint Stipulation on Unresolved Matters in Support of Motion to Compel Compliance, #8 Proof of Service)(Attorney Charles S LiMandri added to party Center for Medical Progress(pty:dft))(LiMandri, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc et al v. Center for Medical Progress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress
Represented By: Paul M Jonna
Represented By: Charles S LiMandri
Represented By: Peter C Breen
Represented By: Catherine W Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomax Procurement Services, LLC
Represented By: Paul M Jonna
Represented By: Charles S LiMandri
Represented By: Peter C Breen
Represented By: Catherine W Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albin Rhomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Co-Conspirators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daleiden
Represented By: Paul M Jonna
Represented By: Charles S LiMandri
Represented By: Peter C Breen
Represented By: Catherine W Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip S. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Susan Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Adrian Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sarkis
Represented By: Paul M Jonna
Represented By: Charles S LiMandri
Represented By: Peter C Breen
Represented By: Catherine W Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Tennenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Center for Choice
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Rocky Mountains
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Santa Barbara, Ventura and San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc.
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenhood Orange and San Bernardino Counties, Inc.
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Pasadena and San Gabriel Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc.
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc.
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles
Represented By: Jee Young You
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Amy L. Bomse
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc. doing business as Planned Parenthood Northern California
Represented By: Helene T Krasnoff
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Beth H Parker
Represented By: Amy L Bomse
Represented By: Jee Young You
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah Nucatola
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?