In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Md Ullah, John Seward, Joshua Kim, Noe Riveron, Krystina Bonilla, Alejandro Ramirez, Elizabeth Evans, Courtney Maine, Alexander Perez, Charles Williams, Marlene Martinez, Michael Van Ness, Eduardo Consuegra, Rex Weston, Lynn Cox, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Larry Flowers, Kathy Cleghorn, Danny Bustamante, Curline Registe, Matthew Aquino, Bernadette Polansky, James F Bliss, Marvin Coyner, Gaylynn Sanchez, Alexia Bouclier, Carolyn Nelson, Eric Fishon, Kinyata Jones, Judith Servis, Linda Cooper, Michael Hernandez, Ryan Frazier, Ryan Baldwin, Bridget Miller, Juan Zamora, Christina McCormick, Nicholas Crouch, Mark Altier, Mark D. Altier, Thomas H. Price, Kaya Lawrence, Donna Richards, James Carroll, Cynthia Sacchetti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Maureen Heiner, Carma Rockers, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Eric Ruiz, Billy Blaylock, Ann Marie Gray, Tina Fuller, Christy Sullivan, Yamira Collazo, William Hauser, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Adalgisa Santos, Brent DeRouen, Yoni Breve, Margaret Rizzo, Remi Rundzio, Fredericka McPherson, Andrea Shields, Dee Roberts, Cynthia Acker, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Maximillian Accetta, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Gilberto Perez, Tonya McNeely, Brian Chaiken, Gerald Strauss, Jason Klein, Eldon Painter, Thomas Payne, Tammy Tyler, Jose Portillo, Thomas Copley, Jan Freyman, Laura Shimko, Xin Wang, Desiree Meyer, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Felicia Jeffries, Dragan Jagnjic, Carl Paul Maurilus, William Baerresen, Robert A Underwood, Grissell Denizard, Curtis Resta, Jami S Oliver, Ann Harland, David Radi, Alice Smith, Gary Samouris, Christopher Berry, Evan Green, Tonya Skinner, Jennifer Johnson, Vania Silva, Jason Janson, Andrea Acosta, Samuel Choc, Moises Senti, Armando Paz, Jr, Alvin Duncan, Carolyn McFadden, William Bell, Diana King, Steve Keister, Erin Reilly, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Tommy Bentley, Richard Narez, Michael Hines, Ryan Crespo, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Steve Croft, Amanda Swanson, Jessica Kelly and Harry Smith
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants, Toyota Motor Corp, Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc, KIA Motor America, Inc, Honda R and D Americas, Inc, Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc, Honda Motor Co., Ltd., KIA Motors America, Hyundai Motor America, Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Kia Motors Corporation, American Honda Motor Co., Inc, TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Honda R and D Co., Ltd., Hyundai Motor Co., Ltd., TRW Automotive, Inc., A Cura, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., Hyundai Motor Group, Hyundai Motor Co, ZF Friedrichshafen AG, Hyndai Motor America, Hyundai Mobis Co. Ltd, Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp, FCA US LLC, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc, Mitsubishi Motors America, Inc. and Acura
Petitioner: BONNIE DELLATORRE and KENNETH OGOREK
In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 2:2019ml02905
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of address by Laurence D King attorney for Plaintiffs Cynthia Acker, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Ryan Baldwin, Linda Cooper, Joshua Kim, Jason Klein, Christina McCormick, Erin Reilly, Eric Ruiz, Alice Smith, Harry Smith, Rex Weston. Changing attorneys address to 1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1560, Oakland, CA 94612. Filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Acker, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Ryan Baldwin, Linda Cooper, Joshua Kim, Jason Klein, Christina McCormick, Erin Reilly, Eric Ruiz, Alice Smith, Harry Smith, Rex Weston. (Attorney Laurence D King added to party Harry Smith(pty:pla))(King, Laurence)
December 23, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of address by Mario Man-Lung Choi attorney for Plaintiffs Cynthia Acker, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Ryan Baldwin, Linda Cooper, Joshua Kim, Jason Klein, Christina McCormick, Erin Reilly, Alice Smith, Harry Smith. Changing attorneys address to 1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1560, Oakland, CA 94612. Filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Acker, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Ryan Baldwin, Linda Cooper, Joshua Kim, Jason Klein, Christina McCormick, Erin Reilly, Alice Smith, Harry Smith. (Attorney Mario Man-Lung Choi added to party Bilal Mohammad Ali(pty:pla), Attorney Mario Man-Lung Choi added to party Ryan Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Mario Man-Lung Choi added to party Joshua Kim(pty:pla), Attorney Mario Man-Lung Choi added to party Jason Klein(pty:pla), Attorney Mario Man-Lung Choi added to party Erin Reilly(pty:pla), Attorney Mario Man-Lung Choi added to party Harry Smith(pty:pla))(Choi, Mario)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #61 , for the following reasons: Complaints to initiate a new case in this district that are related to the MDL case must be filed as a new civil case. Counsel shall refile this case as a new case, at which time the Court will review the case to determine if it relates to this MDL. (jp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 61 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 12/20/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #62 ] - COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24949579 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff BONNIE DELLATORRE, KENNETH OGOREK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Hyundai Motor America Inc., #3 Proposed Summons to Kia Motors America Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.) (Attorney Stacey P Slaughter added to party BONNIE DELLATORRE(pty:bkmov), Attorney Stacey P Slaughter added to party KENNETH OGOREK(pty:bkmov))(Slaughter, Stacey) Modified on 12/20/2019 (jp).
November 12, 2019 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist for Registered Agent of Service of Process for Defendant FCA US LLC in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. served on October 23, 2019. (Weaver, Lesley)
November 4, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Rosemary M Rivas counsel for Plaintiff Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC. Changing Address to 388 Market Street, Suite 1300 San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Plaintiff Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC. (Rivas, Rosemary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Rosanne Leigh Mah counsel for Plaintiff Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC. Changing Address to 388 Market Street, Suite 1300 San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Plaintiff Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC. (Mah, Rosanne)
November 4, 2019 Filing 57 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Danny Bustamante, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Michael Hines, Grissell Denizard, Gilberto Perez, Eduardo Consuegra, Marlene Martinez, Alexia Bouclier, Armando Paz, Jr, Noe Riveron, Juan Zamora, Andrea Acosta, Alejandro Ramirez, Bernadette Polansky, Yoni Breve, Krystina Bonilla, Samuel Choc, Jose Portillo, Ryan Crespo, Brian Chaiken. Waiver of Service signed by Caroline Van Ness. (Prieto, Peter)
October 31, 2019 Filing 56 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Danny Bustamante, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Michael Hines, Grissell Denizard, Gilberto Perez, Eduardo Consuegra, Marlene Martinez, Alexia Bouclier, Armando Paz, Jr, Noe Riveron, Juan Zamora, Andrea Acosta, Alejandro Ramirez, Bernadette Polansky, Yoni Breve, Krystina Bonilla, Samuel Choc, Jose Portillo, Ryan Crespo, Brian Chaiken. Waiver of Service signed by Michael L. Mallow. (Prieto, Peter)
October 31, 2019 Filing 55 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendant Honda of America Mfg., Inc. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Danny Bustamante, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Michael Hines, Grissell Denizard, Gilberto Perez, Eduardo Consuegra, Marlene Martinez, Alexia Bouclier, Armando Paz, Jr, Noe Riveron, Juan Zamora, Alejandro Ramirez, Bernadette Polansky, Yoni Breve, Krystina Bonilla, Samuel Choc, Jose Portillo, Ryan Crespo, Brian Chaiken. Waiver of Service signed by Eric S. Mattson. (Prieto, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 54 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendant Honda R&D Americas, Inc. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Danny Bustamante, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Michael Hines, Grissell Denizard, Gilberto Perez, Eduardo Consuegra, Marlene Martinez, Alexia Bouclier, Armando Paz, Jr, Noe Riveron, Juan Zamora, Andrea Acosta, Alejandro Ramirez, Bernadette Polansky, Yoni Breve, Krystina Bonilla, Samuel Choc, Jose Portillo, Ryan Crespo, Brian Chaiken. Waiver of Service signed by Eric S. Mattson. (Prieto, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff, Thomas Payne, et al. Danny Bustamante, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Michael Hines, Grissell Denizard, Gilberto Perez, Eduardo Consuegra, Marlene Martinez, Alexia Bouclier, Armando Paz, Jr, Noe Riveron, Juan Zamora, Andrea Acosta, Alejandro Ramirez, Bernadette Polansky, Yoni Breve, Krystina Bonilla, Samuel Choc, Jose Portillo, Ryan Crespo, Brian Chaiken. Waiver of Service signed by Eric S. Mattson. (Prieto, Peter)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of attorney W Daniel Dee Miles III for Plaintiff Sigfredo Rubio in place and stead of attorney Edward F Kickham, Jr., Jamie K Warrow and Gregory D Hanley. (jp)
October 23, 2019 Filing 51 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. Waiver of Service signed by Michael L. Mallow. (Weaver, Lesley)
October 10, 2019 Filing 50 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. Waiver of Service signed by Douglas W. Robinson. (Weaver, Lesley)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt Granting W. Daniel Miles III in place and stead of attorney Jamie K Warrow; Gregory D Hanley and Edward F Kickham, Jr. (lt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Harry Smith, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marc Zabala, Authorized Person to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 8, 2019 Filing 47 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendants ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLC WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy A. Tsoumas. (Weaver, Lesley)
October 8, 2019 Filing 46 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and KIA Motors America, Inc. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. Waiver of Service signed by Caroline Van Ness. (Weaver, Lesley)
October 8, 2019 Filing 45 Waiver of Service of Summons WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. Waiver of Service signed by Stacy Horth-Neubert. (Weaver, Lesley)
October 8, 2019 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Harry Smith, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Demonte, Authorized Person at CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 8, 2019 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Harry Smith, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Authorized Person at CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 8, 2019 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Harry Smith, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 8, 2019 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Harry Smith, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Authorized Person at National Registered Agents in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 8, 2019 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Harry Smith, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 8, 2019 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Harry Smith, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares, Agent for CSC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 8, 2019 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina McCormick, Alice Smith, Cynthia Acker, Linda Cooper, Harry Smith, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Authorized Person at CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Choi, Mario)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING ADDITIONAL MATTERS FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE AGENDA (DKT. 32) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based upon a review of the parties' requests, good cause has been shown to include the proposed, additional items at the February 24, 2020 Initial Conference. The Initial Conference shall proceed based on the revised agenda that is appended to this Order. These additional items should also be addressed in the Preliminary Report. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #29 Sigfredo Rubio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kickham, Edward)
October 1, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 30, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas counsel for Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. William R. Squires III is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Tsoumas, Tammy)
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE KICKHAM HANDLEY PLLC'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (DKT. #29 ) RE CASE LA CV19-06898 JAK (FFMx) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel shall refer to this Court's General Form G-01 and G-123. Upon the filing of the applicable form, the request will be granted. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 JOINT REPORT of Additional Matters for Initial Conference Agenda filed by Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Automotive, Inc., TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Regan, Matthew)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: #19 , #30 Non-Resident Attorney Brandi L Burke APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC, designating Kacey R Riccomini as local counsel. (jp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandi L. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24436727) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riccomini, Kacey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Gregory D. Hanley, Jamie K. Warrow and Edward F. Kickham Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Counsel for Plaintiff Sigfredo Rubio. (Kickham, Edward)
September 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandi L. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24436727) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process for Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process for Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process for Defendant FCA USA LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process for Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Greene Intake Manager for Registered agent for service of process for Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Frances Fernandez, intake manager for National Registered Agents as agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , for the following reasons: (1) Title page is missing; (2) All documents are to have a title/caption page pursuant to L.R. 11-3.8. Counsel shall refile the document no later than 09/18/2019, using this Court's Civil Form CV-001 (POS-010) for the filing of all proofs of service. The caption shall comply with the Court's September 6, 2019 Order. Dkt. 4. (jp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandi L. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24436727) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riccomini, Kacey)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #9 , for the following reasons: (1) Title page is missing; (2) All documents are to have a title/caption page pursuant to L.R. 11-3.8. Counsel shall refile the document no later than 09/18/2019. (jp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandi L. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24436727) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): No signature on Application. Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). (lt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark V Berry on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc, Toyota Motor North America, Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc (Attorney Mark V Berry added to party Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mark V Berry added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mark V Berry added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc(pty:dft))(Berry, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp).
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp).
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp).
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp).
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Frances Fernandez, intake manager for National Registered Agents as agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp).
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp).
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Greene Intake Manager for Registered agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp).
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandi L. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24436727) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riccomini, Kacey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc, Toyota Motor North America, Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc (Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc(pty:dft))(Galvin, Vincent)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter G Safirstein on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Van Ness (Attorney Peter G Safirstein added to party Michael Van Ness(pty:pla))(Safirstein, Peter)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (ALL CASES) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Because these complex cases warrant appropriate oversight and collaborative management, counsel shall refer to this Order for details. An Initial Conference is set for February 24, 2020 at 1:30 pm. Counsel for all parties shall appear. (ake)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PREPARATION OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This Court has been assigned MDL No. 2905 (the "MDL"). Any individual case that this Court or the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation relates to the MDL will be closed. All filings shall be made in the docket of the MDL uponthe transfer of the individual case as stated in this Order. (ake)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. With the consent of that court, all such actions havebeen assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (jp)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. With the consent of that court, all such actions have been assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (lom)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2:19-ml-02905-JAK-FFMx, In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for Discovery. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Md Ullah
Represented By: Jeffrey B Kosbie
Represented By: David K Stein
Represented By: Richard D Meadow
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Alex J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Seward
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Kim
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Riveron
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystina Bonilla
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ramirez
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Evans
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Erika M Keech
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Maine
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Perez
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Williams
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Martinez
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Van Ness
Represented By: Peter G Safirstein
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Ex Kano S Sams, II
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Consuegra
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Weston
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Cox
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilal Mohammad Ali
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Flowers
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: John A Hurt
Represented By: Michael J Pacelli
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Cleghorn
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Bustamante
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curline Registe
Represented By: Nicholas R Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Aquino
Represented By: Theodore W Maya
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Bradley K King
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Polansky
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F Bliss
Represented By: Jerome H Mooney
Represented By: Michael R Cashman
Represented By: Richard M Hagstrom
Represented By: G Randall Garrou
Represented By: John H Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Coyner
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Erika M Keech
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylynn Sanchez
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexia Bouclier
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Nelson
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fishon
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinyata Jones
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Servis
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Bethany L Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan K Levine
Represented By: Heather P Haggarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cooper
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Marc H Edelson
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Joshua H Grabar
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Justin B Farar
Represented By: Matthew B George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: David S Stellings
Represented By: Nimish R Desai
Represented By: Roland K Tellis
Represented By: John T Nicolaou
Represented By: David Brian Fernandes, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth G Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Frazier
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Baldwin
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Miller
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Zamora
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina McCormick
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Marc H Edelson
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Joshua H Grabar
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Justin B Farar
Represented By: Matthew B George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Crouch
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Altier
Represented By: David J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D. Altier
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Price
Represented By: Jerome H Mooney
Represented By: Michael R Cashman
Represented By: Richard M Hagstrom
Represented By: G Randall Garrou
Represented By: John H Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaya Lawrence
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Richards
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carroll
Represented By: Jeffrey B Kosbie
Represented By: David K Stein
Represented By: Richard D Meadow
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Alex J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sacchetti
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fuller, Sr.
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Heiner
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carma Rockers
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: John A Hurt
Represented By: Michael J Pacelli
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Represented By: Eric B Snyder
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bowens
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ruiz
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Blaylock
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Gray
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Fuller
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Sullivan
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamira Collazo
Represented By: Nicholas R Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hauser
Represented By: Jonathan S Mann
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Adam W Pittman
Represented By: Christopher T Hellums
Represented By: Hirlye R Lutz, III
Represented By: Lauren Sanderson Miller
Represented By: Lauren S Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Heilman-Ryan
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adalgisa Santos
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent DeRouen
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoni Breve
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Rizzo
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Represented By: Eric B Snyder
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remi Rundzio
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredericka McPherson
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Shields
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Represented By: Eric B Snyder
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Roberts
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: John A Hurt
Represented By: Michael J Pacelli
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Acker
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Marc H Edelson
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Joshua H Grabar
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Justin B Farar
Represented By: Matthew B George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nida Edith Samson
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David J. Shea
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Burns
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: John A Hurt
Represented By: Michael J Pacelli
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximillian Accetta
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Santos-Silva
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Perez
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya McNeely
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Chaiken
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Strauss
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Klein
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon Painter
Represented By: Jeffrey B Kosbie
Represented By: David K Stein
Represented By: Richard D Meadow
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Alex J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Payne
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Tyler
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: David S Stellings
Represented By: Nimish R Desai
Represented By: Roland K Tellis
Represented By: John T Nicolaou
Represented By: David Brian Fernandes, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth G Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Portillo
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Copley
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Erika M Keech
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Freyman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Shimko
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Represented By: Eric B Snyder
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xin Wang
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Represented By: Eric B Snyder
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Meyer
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC
Represented By: Rosanne Leigh Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Jeffries
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dragan Jagnjic
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Paul Maurilus
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Baerresen
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Underwood
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grissell Denizard
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Resta
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami S Oliver
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Represented By: Eric B Snyder
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Harland
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Radi
Represented By: Nicholas R Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Smith
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Marc H Edelson
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Joshua H Grabar
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Justin B Farar
Represented By: Matthew B George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Samouris
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David J. Shea
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Berry
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: John A Hurt
Represented By: Michael J Pacelli
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Green
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Skinner
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Johnson
Represented By: Matthew J Preusch
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vania Silva
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Janson
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Acosta
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Choc
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Senti
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Paz, Jr
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Duncan
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn McFadden
Represented By: Clayeo C Arnold
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Joshua H Watson
Represented By: Ryan J McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bell
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana King
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Represented By: Brandy L Worden
Represented By: John A Hurt
Represented By: Michael J Pacelli
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Michael F Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Keister
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Reilly
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cause 4 Paws, Inc
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Bentley
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Narez
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hines
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Crespo
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Steel
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Renteria
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Croft
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Bethany L Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan K Levine
Represented By: Heather P Haggarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Swanson
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kelly
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Smith
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc
Represented By: Mark V Berry
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA Motor America, Inc
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H Beisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R and D Americas, Inc
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Represented By: Eric S Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda of America Mfg., Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Represented By: Eric S Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc
Represented By: Mark V Berry
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA Motors America
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H Beisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H Beisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Represented By: George B Donnini
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Represented By: Eric S Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R and D Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Cura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyndai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Mobis Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc
Represented By: Christopher J Green
Represented By: Erica M Sorosky
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp
Represented By: Jason Wilcox
Represented By: Judson D Brown
Represented By: Herbert C Donovan
Represented By: Matthew Letzmann
Represented By: William R Squires, III
Represented By: Michael A Glick
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Represented By: Matthew T Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Stephen A D'Aunoy
Represented By: Kacey Renee Riccomini
Represented By: James Simon Coons
Represented By: Brandi L Burke
Represented By: Kathy A Wisniewski
Represented By: Thomas L Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: Mark V Berry
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Carmen M Bickerdt
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BONNIE DELLATORRE
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENNETH OGOREK
Represented By: Stacey P Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?