Marc Oiknine et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marc Oiknine, Benjamin Ariel Oiknine and Hanna Oiknine
Defendant: American Airlines, Iberia Airlines, Iberia Airlines, Inc., Does 1 through 50, Inclusive and American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00106
Filed: January 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 01/06/2019, receipt number 0973-25062024), filed by Plainitff Marc Oiknine. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Interested Parties)(Saidian, Rabin)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. Attachment 2 Summons should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints and select Summons Request.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The Civil Cover Sheet category event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 01/06/2019, receipt number 0973-25062024), filed by Plaintiff Marc Oiknine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Attorney Rabin Saidian added to party Marc Oiknine(pty:pla))(Saidian, Rabin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marc Oiknine et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Oiknine
Represented By: Rabin Saidian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ariel Oiknine
Represented By: Rabin Saidian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Oiknine
Represented By: Rabin Saidian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?